Martin Vogel v. Fikrat Edward Cotta et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Jay C Gandhi |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00482 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Fikrat Edward Cotta
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nejood Cotta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Vogel
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
54 | 54
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 04/17 12:28 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. It is therefore now ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that judgment is entered in this action as follows: 1. Plaintiff Martin Vogel shall recover nothing from Defendants Fitrat Edward Cotta and Nejood Cotta on Plaintiff Martin Vogels operative Complaint, and his claims are dismissed on their merits and with prejudice; 2. Defendants Fitrat Edward Cotta and Nejood Cotta shall have judgment in their favor on Plaintiff Martin Vogels operative Complaint; and 3. Defendants shall recover from Plaintiff Martin Vogel costs of suit pursuant to a bill of costs filed in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1920. Related to: Order on Motion for Summary Judgment53 . (twdb) |