Braden A. Bennett v. UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | Jay C Gandhi |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00484 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Braden A. Bennett
an individual 1312 E Warner Avenue
Santa Ana, CA 92705 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order
Tue 06/27 9:50 AM
ORDER Dismissing the Entire Action With Prejudice15 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Pursuant to the Stipulation of the parties, the Court hereby orders that the above-entitled action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party shall bear its and his own fees and costs. (lwag) |
|
15 | 15
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 06/26 2:46 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Case Settling filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company.(Ernster, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Dismissing the Entire Action with Prejudice | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 05/15 8:33 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Staying Action Pending Final Settlement and Removing Case From Active Caseload by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. On May 11, 2017, counsel for defendant filed a "Notice of Settlement"13 . The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. It is further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload, subject to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Counsel shall file settlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court by July 31, 2017. The Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this order shall not prejudice any party in the action. All hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are ordered VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dro) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Settlement
Thu 05/11 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Ernster, Shannon) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Wed 04/19 8:25 PM
ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Granting Stipulation Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint11 , Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company answer due 5/22/2017 (mt) |
|
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 04/19 10:58 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to May 22, 2017 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),10 filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company.(Ernster, Shannon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 04/07 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by Plaintiff Braden A. Bennett. (Attorney Braden Allen Bennett added to party Braden A. Bennett(pty:pla))(Bennett, Braden) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Mon 04/03 3:11 PM
DEFENDANT UNITEDHEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY'S CONFIRMATION OF NOTIFYING STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company (Ernster, Shannon) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/23 10:36 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)7 served on 3/23/17. (Ernster, Shannon) |
|
7 | 7
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 03/23 9:59 AM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company answer now due 4/21/2017, filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company.(Ernster, Shannon) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/20 5:57 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on 03/17/17. (Ernster, Shannon) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 4:36 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (ghap) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/17 11:59 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company. (Ernster, Shannon) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 11:58 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company, identifying Plaintiff Braden A. Bennett; Defendant UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company. (Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Ernster, Shannon) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2017 00902459 Receipt No: 0973-19532911 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company. (Attorney Courtney C Hill added to party Unitedhealthcare Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Hill, Courtney) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration In Support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration in Support of Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 4:25 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company., filed by plaintiff Braden A. Bennett. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/9/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) |