Pearson v Pier 1 Imports, Inc.
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Troy L Nunley |
Referred: | Allison Claire |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00569 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Pier 1 Imports, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeanie Pearson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 05/10 2:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/10/2017: Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal (ECF No.4 ) and FRCP 41(a)(1), this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Stipulation
Wed 05/10 2:43 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Pier 1 Imports, Inc.. (Carruth, Michael) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for TLN
Fri 03/17 8:22 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Kaminski, H) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Pier 1 Imports, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal. (Carruth, Michael) Modified on 3/17/2017 (Kaminski, H). | |
1 | 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from El Dorado County Superior, case number SC20160158 by Pier 1 Imports (U.S.), Inc.. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6966595)(Carruth, Michael) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit |