Short v. Winnebago Industries, Inc. et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kimberly J Mueller |
Referred: | Allison Claire |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00571 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 14, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Stier's RV Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Winnebago Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Short
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
order
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 05/14 4:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Pursuant to the parties stipulation of dismissal (ECF No.41 ) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is DISMISSED with prejudice in its entirety. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED; Case CLOSED. (Text Only Entry) (Michel, G.) |
|
41 | 41
misc
Stipulation
Mon 05/14 3:58 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ronald Short. (Gomez, Ryan) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 03/26 11:42 AM
STATUS ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/26/2018 DIRECTING the parties to file, within 60 days of the status conference, a joint status report with the court on the status of this case. (York, M) |
|
Thursday, March 15, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 03/15 11:48 AM
MINUTES for STATUS CONFERENCE held before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/15/2018. Plaintiff's Counsel, Ryan Gomez, present. Defendants' Counsel, Thomas Murphy, present by telephone. The court and counsel discussed the status of the parties' settlement agreement. A written order will issue. Court Reporter: Kelly OHalloran. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
order
Minute Order
Tue 03/13 2:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Based on the representations made by Mr. Murphy in the Request for Telephonic Appearance, the court is willing to make an exception to its standing order requiring personal appearance. Accordingly, the Request for Telephonic Appearance (ECF No.37 ) is GRANTED and conference call instructions will be emailed to Attorney Thomas Murphy. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Request for Telephonic Appearance
Tue 03/13 11:14 AM
AMENDED REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 3/15/2018 Status Conference hearing by Stier's RV Center, LLC, Winnebago Industries, Inc.. (Murphy, Thomas) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Minute Order
Mon 03/12 10:14 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: No good cause having been shown, Defendants' Request for Telephonic Appearance (ECF No.35 ) is DENIED without prejudice. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Request for Telephonic Appearance
Fri 03/09 3:21 PM
REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE at the 3/15/2018 Status Conference hearing by Stier's RV Center, LLC, Winnebago Industries, Inc.. (Murphy, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Status Report
Thu 03/08 4:11 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ronald Short. (Gomez, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 02/27 10:15 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status Conference set for 3/15/2018 at 2:30 PM is ADVANCED on the same date to 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Declaration
Mon 02/26 9:53 AM
DECLARATION of Ryan H. Gomez re 31 Minute Order,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,,,,. (Gomez, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 01/11 11:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court is in receipt of the parties' Stipulation to Extend Time to File Dismissal. ECF No.30 . As noted in ECF No. 29, the court has twice granted the parties' extension requests and any further extension requests may be granted only for good cause shown. After reviewing the parties' stipulation, the court determines good cause is shown, and the parties' request for an extension of time to file a stipulation for dismissal is therefore GRANTED nunc pro tunc to 1/10/2018. Accordingly, the deadline for the parties to file a stipulation for dismissal is EXTENDED to 2/26/2018. On its own motion, the court sets a Status Conference for 3/15/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report seven days prior to the status conference. In the event the parties file dispositional documents prior to the scheduled status conference, the court will vacate the status conference. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Stipulation
Wed 01/10 3:39 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to File Dismissal by Stier's RV Center, LLC, Winnebago Industries, Inc.. (Murphy, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 12/12 2:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of the additional time needed for the parties to finalize settlement, the joint request for extension of time (ECF No.28 ) is GRANTED nunc pro tunc to 12/11/2017. Accordingly, the deadline for the parties to file a stipulation for dismissal is EXTENDED to 1/10/2018. Having twice granted the parties' extension request, further requests for an extension will be granted only for good cause. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Stipulation
Mon 12/11 12:09 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to File Dismissal by Stier's RV Center, LLC, Winnebago Industries, Inc. (Murphy, Thomas) Modified on 12/11/2017 |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 11/13 2:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of the additional time needed for the parties to finalize settlement, the joint request for extension of time (ECF No.26 ) is GRANTED nunc pro tunc to 11/9/2017. Accordingly, the deadline for the parties to file a stipulation for dismissal is EXTENDED to 12/11/2017. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation
Mon 11/13 10:27 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to File Dismissal by Winnebago Industries, Inc.. (Murphy, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Stipulation
Wed 11/08 4:21 PM
STIPULATION by Stier's RV Center, LLC, Winnebago Industries, Inc.. (Murphy, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 10/19 1:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Pursuant to the 10/19/2017 Notice of Removal from the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program, the court has determined this case has settled. Dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 11/9/2017. Accordingly, all previously set deadlines and hearings are VACATED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
23 | 23
adr
Removal from VDRP
Thu 10/19 12:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from VDRP. Plaintiff's counsel has communicated to the VDRP Neutral that this case settled prior to the VDRP process.[TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Crouch, J) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
adr
Appointment of VDRP Neutral Attorney
Mon 09/18 8:40 AM
NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT from VDRP Administrator appointing John Fagan, of Duane Morris LLP, as VDRP Neutral Attorney.[TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Crouch, J) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order ~Util - Case Referred to VDRP ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 08/17 10:13 AM
STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/16/17. Initial disclosures shall becompleted by 8/24/2017. All discovery shall be completed by 10/2/2017. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 10/9/2017, and rebuttal disclosures due by 10/30/2017. All expert discovery shall be completed by 11/27/2017. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restrainingorders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 12/8/2017. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 3/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The parties shall confer and file a joint pretrial conference statement by 3/2/2018. The Jury Trial is SET for 5/7/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Trial briefs are due by 4/23/2018. This matter is REFERRED to the court's ADR Coordinator, Sujean Park, forthe convening of a VDRP session to take place in late October 2017. (Kastilahn, A) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Thu 08/03 12:08 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE held on 8/3/2017. Plaintiff's Counsel, Terry Baker and Ryan Gomez, present. Defendants' Counsel, Thomas Murphy, present. The court and counsel discussed case scheduling. Counsel discussed referring the matter to VDRP. A formal written scheduling order will issue. Court Reporter: Diane Shepard. (Waldrop, A) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 07/28 4:47 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy A. Waldrop for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status Conference set for 8/3/2017 at 2:30 PM is ADVANCED on the same date to 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Waldrop, A) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minute Order
Thu 07/20 11:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: The court requires personal appearance at the initial Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference. Accordingly, Defendants' Request for Telephonic Appearance, ECF No.17 , is DENIED. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Request
Thu 07/20 9:09 AM
REQUEST for to Appear at Status Conference by Telephone and Order by Stier's RV Center, LLC, Winnebago Industries, Inc.. (Murphy, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 05/25 10:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of Plaintiff's Counsel's unavailability, the parties' stipulated request to continue (ECF No.14 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 6/8/2017 is VACATED and RESET for 8/3/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The Request for Telephonic Appearance (ECF No.13 ) is DENIED as MOOT. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 05/23 5:13 PM
NOTICE Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by All Defendants. (Murphy, Thomas) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 05/23 2:37 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference re 12 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, by Ronald Short. (Baker, Terry) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Request
Thu 05/18 12:25 PM
REQUEST for Appearance by Telephone by Ronald Short re 12 Minute Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,. (Baker, Terry) |
|
12 | 12
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 05/18 8:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: In light of a scheduling conflict and on the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 5/25/2017 is VACATED and RESET for 6/8/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Wed 05/17 5:03 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ronald Short. (Gomez, Ryan) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 04/20 9:13 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 7/20/2017 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 5/25/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/19 5:15 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Stier's RV Center, LLC, Winnebago Industries, Inc..(Murphy, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/05 3:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Ronald Short re3 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Gomez, Ryan) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Wed 04/05 3:04 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ronald Short. (Gomez, Ryan) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Wed 04/05 1:54 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Stier's RV Center, LLC, Winnebago Industries, Inc.. Attorney Murphy, Thomas M added. (Murphy, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 03/29 1:07 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Stier's RV Center, LLC served on 3/20/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Gomez, Ryan) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 03/29 1:05 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Winnebago Industries, Inc. served on 3/20/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Gomez, Ryan) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Civil New Case Documents for KJM
Fri 03/17 8:58 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Att: 1 Standing Order, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 3 VDRP | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons
Fri 03/17 8:57 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Stier's RV Center, LLC, Winnebago Industries, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ryan Hall Gomez* *Law Offices Of Jon Jacobs* *3031 Stanford Ranch Rd., #2-150* *Rocklin, CA 95765*. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Ronald Short.(Gomez, Ryan) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Receipt
Fri 03/17 8:36 AM
RECEIPT number 0972-6966950 for $400.00 for civil filing fee from Ryan Hall Gomez. (Zignago, K.) |