(PS) Ristau et al v. Guardians of El Dorado County et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Morrison C England, Jr |
Referred: | Kendall J Newman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00574 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:04 AM PDT |
Defendant
CIT Bank N.A.
|
|
Defendant
Financial Freedom
|
|
Defendant
Guardians of El Dorado County
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven A. Leonard
Heir of the estate of Janet L. Ristau 1552 American River Trail
Cool, CA 95614 |
|
Plaintiff
Janet L. Ristau
1552 American River Trail
Cool, CA 95614 |
|
Plaintiff
Karen L. Ristau
Heir of the estate of Janet L. Ristau 1552 American River Trail
Cool, CA 95614 |
|
Plaintiff
Robert J. Ristau
Heir of the estate of Janet L. Ristau 1552 American River Trail
Cool, CA 95614 |
Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago |
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 12/12 10:53 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable - Forward Time Expired-RTS:5 Order and6 Judgment sent to net L. Ristau (at 1552 American River Trail, Cool, CA 95614). (York, M) |
||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Tue 12/05 9:07 AM
JUDGMENT dated *12/5/2017* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/4/2017. (Washington, S) |
|
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Tue 12/05 9:07 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/4/2017; ADOPTING4 Findings and Recommendations; The action is DISMISSED without prejudice; and The Clerk of Court shall close this case. CASE CLOSED (Washington, S) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 12/05 9:08 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:6 Judgment,5 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Steven A. Leonard, Janet L. Ristau, Karen L. Ristau, Robert J. Ristau. (Washington, S) |
||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 10/12 1:03 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable,4 Findings and Recommendations sent to Janet L. Ristau. Notice of Change of Address due by 12/18/2017. (Becknal, R) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Wed 10/04 1:07 PM
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/4/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Wed 10/04 1:07 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Findings and Recommendations served on Steven A. Leonard, Janet L. Ristau, Karen L. Ristau, Robert J. Ristau. (Zignago, K.) |
||
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 08/29 11:45 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/28/17 ORDERING that Mr. Leonard's2 Motion to Proceed IFP is DENIED without prejudice. Within 28 days, plaintiffs shall either (a) pay the applicable filing fee or (b) each file an IFP application that adequately demonstrates that each plaintiff is unable to pay the filing fee. Plaintiffs' failure to either pay the filing fee or file sufficient IFP applications by the above deadline will result in a recommendation that the action be dismissed. (Benson, A.) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 08/29 11:46 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order served on Steven A. Leonard, Janet L. Ristau, Karen L. Ristau, Robert J. Ristau. (Benson, A.) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/17 12:14 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Steven A. Leonard. (Zignago, K.) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 12:13 PM
COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Karen L. Ristau, Janet L. Ristau, Robert J. Ristau, Steven A. Leonard. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
IFP Application
Fri 03/17 12:15 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Zignago, K.) |