|
GPO
Mar 17 2017
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE SACRAMENTO DIVISION of the Eastern District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/17/2017. New Case Number 2:17-cv-00575-GGH (HC). Old Case Number 1:17-cv-00362-MJS (HC). (Jessen, A)
|
|
GPO
Mar 24 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/24/2017 ORDERING petitioner to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk shall send petitioner an ifp form.(Yin, K)
|
|
GPO
Jul 20 2017
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/17/2017 GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner to file opposition to 10 Motion to Dismiss by 8/29/2017. (Henshaw, R)
|
|
GPO
Sep 25 2017
er to a district court judge. Assigned to US District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. and US Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows; the new case number is 2:17-cv-0575 GEB GGH (HC). (Yin, K)ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/22/2017 ORDERING petitioner to show cause, within 15 days, why his failure to file his opposition as ordered should not be deemed a waiver of any opposition to the granting of the motion, or he shall file an opposition. Petitioner is cautioned that failure to respond timely to this Order to Show cause will lead to a recommendation that his petition shall be dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall randomly assign this matt
|
|
GPO
Oct 23 2017
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/23/2017 RECOMMENDING that the 1 Petition should be dismissed with prejudice, no Certificate of Appealability should issue and the Clerk of the Court shall close this file. Objections due within 20 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Hunt, G)
|