Randle v. First Advantage Background Services Corp.
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Troy L Nunley |
Referred: | Carolyn K Delaney |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00576 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 07, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
First Advantage Background Services Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terrence MacArthur Randle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
order
Minute Order
Fri 01/11 9:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/11/2019: In light of the Order closing this case pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal (ECF No. 25), the Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 23) is hereby DISCHARGED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
order
Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 01/07 9:57 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/7/2019: Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal (ECF No.24 ) and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorney's fees and costs. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) |
|
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation
Fri 01/04 2:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Terrence MacArthur Randle.(Tatar, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
23 | 23
order
Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 01/04 7:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/4/2019: The Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 2:00 PM, and the Jury Trial set for 3/11/2019 are hereby VACATED. The parties are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, not later than fourteen (14) days following the entry of this Minute Order, as to why they should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $250 for failure to file their Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement as set forth in this Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order dated 11/3/2017 (ECF No.13 ). The parties are FURTHER ORDERED to include a statement regarding their readiness to proceed to trial, along with new proposed trial dates. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
adr
Removal from VDRP
Wed 04/11 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from VDRP. The neutral has communicated that he has been advised by counsel for both sides that this action has settled; prior to the scheduled VDRP mediation. [TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Crouch, J) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 12/21 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Megan H. Poonolly by First Advantage Background Services Corp.. (Kwan, Sophia) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
adr
Appointment of VDRP Neutral Attorney
Wed 11/22 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT from VDRP Administrator appointing Andrew Stroud, of Hanson Bridgett LLP, as VDRP Neutral Attorney.[TEXT ONLY ENTRY] (Crouch, J) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Wed 11/15 10:59 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/13/17. Added attorney Esther Slater McDonald for First Advantage Background Services Corp., (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
18 | 18
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Wed 11/15 10:55 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/14/17. Added attorney Frederick T. Smith, PHV for First Advantage Background Services Corp. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Tue 11/14 9:42 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by First Advantage Background Services Corp.: Amended14 Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order. (Kwan, Sophia) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Thu 11/09 11:57 AM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by First Advantage Background Services Corp.: Amended15 Pro Hac Vice Application and Proposed Order. (Kwan, Sophia) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Thu 11/09 10:11 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by First Advantage Background Services Corp. for attorney Esther S. McDonald to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7356968) (Kwan, Sophia) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Wed 11/08 2:41 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by First Advantage Background Services Corp. for attorney Frederick T. Smith to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7355727) (Kwan, Sophia) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 11/03 11:48 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/2/2017 ORDERING: Discovery due by 3/21/2018; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/31/2018; Dispositive Motions heard no later than 9/20/2018; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement due by 1/3/2019; and Jury Trial set for 3/11/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; Upon the stipulation of the parties in their 9/25/2017 Joint Status Report, this matter is hereby referred to the Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program (Hunt, G) Modified on 11/3/2017 (Hunt, G) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Scheduling Report
Mon 09/25 1:00 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Terrence MacArthur Randle. (Tatar, Stephanie) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minute Order
Fri 08/25 10:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Judicial Assistant, D. Morrison for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 08/25/2017: A review of the docket shows that a Joint Status Report has not been filed, pursuant to the Court's Order (ECF No.4 ), filed on 03/17/17. Accordingly, a Joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 09/25/17 with all parties participating. The parties are reminded that failure to file a Joint Status Report timely may result in the imposition of sanctions or dismissal of the case. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY)(Morrison, D) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Pro Hac Vice Order
Fri 06/09 12:26 PM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/8/2017 ORDERING attorney Megan H. Poonolly, added for First Advantage Background Services Corp. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order
Thu 06/08 1:13 PM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by First Advantage Background Services Corp. for attorney Megan H. Poonolly to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7101844) (Kwan, Sophia) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Statement
Thu 05/11 11:33 AM
STATEMENT of Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant First Advantage Background Services Corp.. (Kwan, Sophia) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 05/11 11:30 AM
ANSWER by First Advantage Background Services Corp..(Kwan, Sophia) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/25 1:46 PM
ANSWER by First Advantage Background Services Corp.. Attorney Kwan, Sophia added.(Kwan, Sophia) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 04/25 1:46 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against First Advantage Background Services Corp. by Terrence MacArthur Randle.(Tatar, Stephanie) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil New Case Documents for TLN
Fri 03/17 1:38 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Kaminski, H) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons
Fri 03/17 1:37 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *First Advantage Background Services Corp.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stephanie R. Tatar* *Tatar Law Firm, APC* *3500 West Olive Ave., Suite 300* *Burbank, CA 91505*. (Kaminski, H) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/17 12:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Terrence MacArthur Randle (Tatar, Stephanie) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/17 12:09 PM
COMPLAINT against First Advantage Background Services Corp. by Terrence MacArthur Randle . (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-6968113) (Tatar, Stephanie) Modified on 3/17/2017 (Kaminski, H) |