(SS) Thompson v. Commissioner of Social Security
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carolyn K Delaney |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00584 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2018 |
Defendant
Commissioner of Social Security
|
|
Plaintiff
Sherrie Thompson
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Judgment
Tue 09/18 10:27 AM
JUDGMENT dated *9/18/18* entered pursuant to order signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/18/18. (Kastilahn, A) |
|
22 | 22
12
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 09/18 10:26 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/18/18, ORDERING that Plaintiff's14 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's16 cross-motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Judgment is entered for the Commissioner. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Designation of Counsel
Wed 01/17 11:46 AM
DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Edward Alan Olsen, 28SS29 for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Bobbie J. Montoya, ss terminated (Olsen, Edward) |
|
Monday, January 15, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 01/15 11:44 PM
REPLY by Sherrie Thompson to RESPONSE to16 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (Kaplan, Jesse) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 01/09 11:31 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/9/2018 ORDERING that plaintiffs time to file a reply brief is EXTENDED to 1/15/2018. (Hunt, G) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Fri 01/05 3:08 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time for plaintiff to file reply brief by Sherrie Thompson. (Kaplan, Jesse) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/02 5:41 PM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sherrie Thompson. (Kaplan, Jesse) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 12/15 6:50 PM
CROSS-MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Commissioner of Social Security. (Talbert, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minute Order
Wed 11/29 2:18 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Courtroom Deputy K. Owen for Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/29/2017: Pursuant to the court's scheduling order (see ECF No.6 ), all parties wishing to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction were to file the appropriate form within 90 days. Thus far, plaintiff has failed to indicate her preference. Accordingly, within 14 days of this order, plaintiff shall file the appropriate form notifying the court of her intent to consent or to decline to magistrate judge jurisdiction. So ordered. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Owen, K) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 11/27 11:42 PM
MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Sherrie Thompson. (Kaplan, Jesse) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 11/07 2:09 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/7/2017 ORDERING plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment brief is EXTENDED to 11/27/2017. (Zignago, K.) |
|
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Thu 11/02 3:08 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for extension of time for plaintiff to file motion for summary judgment by Sherrie Thompson. (Kaplan, Jesse) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Acknowledgement of Receipt
Mon 09/11 4:00 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of10 Notice of lodging of the Administrative Record from Commissioner of Social Security. (Becknal, R) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Lodging Social Security Administrative Transcript
Mon 09/11 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Montoya, Bobbie J. added. In Paper Format and E-Filing Electronic Administrative Transcript(Montoya, Bobbie) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development Part 1, | ||
Att: 8 Disability Related Development Part 2, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 13 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 14 Medical Records Part 6, | ||
Att: 15 Medical Records Part 7, | ||
Att: 16 Medical Records Part 8, | ||
Att: 17 Medical Records Part 9, | ||
Att: 18 Medical Records Part 10, | ||
Att: 19 Medical Records Part 11, | ||
Att: 20 Medical Records Part 12, | ||
Att: 21 Medical Records Part 13, | ||
Att: 22 Medical Records Part 14, | ||
Att: 23 Medical Records Part 15, | ||
Att: 24 Medical Records Part 16, | ||
Att: 25 Medical Records Part 17, | ||
Att: 26 Medical Records Part 18, | ||
Att: 27 Medical Records Part 19, | ||
Att: 28 Medical Records Part 20, | ||
Att: 29 Medical Records Part 21, | ||
Att: 30 Medical Records Part 22, | ||
Att: 31 Medical Records Part 23, | ||
Att: 32 Medical Records Part 24, | ||
Att: 33 Medical Records Part 25, | ||
Att: 34 Medical Records Part 26, | ||
Att: 35 Medical Records Part 27, | ||
Att: 36 Medical Records Part 28, | ||
Att: 37 Medical Records Part 29 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/11 9:02 AM
ANSWER by Commissioner of Social Security.(Talbert, Daniel) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 06/27 4:23 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/13/2017. (Nguyen, K) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/19 7:20 AM
CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Talbert, Daniel P. added. (Talbert, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Social Security New Case Documents for MJ as Presider
Wed 03/22 11:11 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 6/23/2017 (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons
Wed 03/22 11:10 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jesse S. Kaplan* *Attorney at Law* *5441 Fair Oaks Boulevard, Suite C-1* *Carmichael, CA 95608*. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/22 11:09 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/22/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request to proceed in forma pauperis3 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. Within fourteen days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM. (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 03/22 11:13 AM
SERVED on USM re4 (Mena-Sanchez, L) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/17 1:58 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sherrie Thompson. (Kaplan, Jesse) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 03/17 1:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sherrie Thompson (Kaplan, Jesse) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Social Security Appeal)
Fri 03/17 1:57 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT regarding denial of disability benefits under the Social Security Act against Commissioner of Social Security by Sherrie Thompson. Attorney Kaplan, Jesse S. added.(Kaplan, Jesse) |
|
misc
IFP Application
Fri 03/17 3:49 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Kaminski, H) |