eMove, Inc. et al v. Hire a Helper LLC et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Cathy Ann Bencivengo |
Referred: | Jill L Burkhardt |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00535 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 12, 2017 2:04 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
Michael Glanz
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Hire a Helper LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
U-Haul International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
eMove, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Glanz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hire a Helper LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
U-Haul International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
eMove, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
226 | 226
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 12/04 4:09 PM
ORDER to Dismiss [Doc. No.225 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/4/2018. (anh) |
|
225 | 225
motion
Dismiss
Tue 12/04 3:04 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Glanz, Hire a Helper LLC.(Horning, Duane) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service |