Demaria et al v. FCA US LLC et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Battaglia |
Referred: | Bernard G Skomal |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00539 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332bw Diversity -Breach of Warranty |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nidhal N. Demaria
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salvatore A. Demaria
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Peck Jeep Eagle, Inc.
Terminated: 03/17/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, July 08, 2021 | ||
124 | 124
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Thu 07/08 2:54 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. No.123 ). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 7/8/2021. (jrm) |
|
123 | 123
motion
Dismiss
Thu 07/08 10:55 AM
Joint MOTION for Order for Dismissal with Prejudice by Nidhal N. Demaria, Salvatore A. Demaria. (Mikhov, Steve) (jrm) |