Ezra Holdings Limited and EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Robert D Drain |
Case #: | 7:17-bk-22405 |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2021 |
Plan Confirmed: | Oct 18, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Ezra Holdings Limited, Debtor
75 South Broadway Fourth Floor, Office 489
White Plains, NY 10601 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Ezra Holdings Limited
75 South Broadway Fourth Floor, Office 489
White Plains, NY 10601 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Ezra Marine Services Pte. Ltd.
75 South Broadway Fourth Floor, Office Numer 489
White Plains, NY 10601 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
EMAS IT Solutions Pte Ltd
75 South Broadway Fourth Floor, Office 489
White Plain, NY 10601 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:14 PM EST |
Attorney
Saul Ewing LLP
|
|
Attorney
Drew & Napier LLC
|
|
Attorney
Saul Ewing Arnstein & Lehr LLP
|
Represented By
|
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent
830 3rd Avenue, 9th Floor www.primeclerk.com
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk, LLC
830 Third Avenue, 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Svenska Handelsbanken AB
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CTBC Bank Co., Ltd. Singapore Branch
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DVB Bank SE Singapore Branch
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DVB Group Merchant Bank (Asia) Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Limited
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
PricewaterhouseCoopers Advisory Services Pte. Ltd.
|
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
|
Unknown
Prima Food
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
VT Halter Marine, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Offshore and subsea services group Ezra files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (seatrade-maritime.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/20/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 30, 2021 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Wed 06/30 2:01 PM
Case Closed. (Correa, Mimi) |