SquareTwo Financial Services Corporation and SquareTwo Unsecured Creditor Distribution Trust
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | James L Garrity Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10659 |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 12, 2020 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jun 09, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
SquareTwo Financial Services Corporation
6300 South Syracuse Way Suite 300
Centennial, CO 80111 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2017 4:52 PM EDT |
Attorney
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
|
Represented By
|
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk, LLC
830 Third Ave, 9th Fl
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Claims and Noticing Agent
Prime Clerk LLC Claims Agent
830 3rd Avenue, 9th Floor www.primeclerk.com
New York, NY 10022 |
|
Creditor
Missouri department of revenue
Bankruptcy Unit PO Box 475 301 W High St.
Jefferson City, MO 65105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vicki Young
4480 Devonshire
Boardman, OH 44512 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Frenkel Lambert et al. 53 Gibson Street
Bay Shore, NY 11706 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
UMB Bank, N.A.
Zucker & Sharfstein, LLP 1201 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
U.S. Bank National Association in its capacity as Indenture Trustee for the 11.625% Senior Second Lien Notes due 2017
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Huntington National Bank
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC 1290 Avenue of the Americas, 30th fl.
New York, NY 10104 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Reverse Mortgage Solutions Incorporated
Robertson, Anschutz & Schneid, P.L. 6409 Congress Ave.,Suite 100
Boca Raton, FL 33487 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PROF-2013-S3 Legal Title Trust II, by U.S. Bank National Association, as Legal Title Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter Shawn M. Christianson 55 2nd St., 17th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
New York Community Bank
401 Franklin Avenue, Suite 300
Garden City, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jolie Johnson
2 Barrister's Place 751 Rockville Pike
Rockville, MD 20852 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Curtis Johnson
2 Barrister's Place 751 Rockville Pike
Rockville, MD 20852 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Capital One, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jacqueline Balti
904 Dover Road
West Memphis, AR 72301 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lynn M. Dingwall
1117 NE Colleen Drive
Lee's Summit, MO 64086 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
B.H. Tempe Commerce, LLC (CA)
c/o Leslie A. Berkoff 400 GARDEN CITY PLAZA
GARDEN CITY, NY 11530 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
America's Capital Partners
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
1251 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020 |
Represented By
|
Financial Advisor
Gavin/Solmonese LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Julie Ann Meade
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cerberus Business Finance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Resurgent Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Toronto-Dominion Bank
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
State of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Michael P. Tatro
05951-070 FCI Fort Dix P.O. Bpx 2000
Joint Base MDL, NJ 08640 |
|
Interested Party
The Canada Trust Company
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Ernst & Young LLP
|
|
Other Prof.
Thornton Grout Finnigan LLP
|
|
Other Prof.
Miller Buckfire & Co., L.L.C.
|
|
Other Prof.
Keefe, Bruyette & Woods, Inc.
|
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Securities and Exchange Commission
Brookfield Place 200 Vesey St., Suite 400
New York, NY 10281 |
Represented By
|
Unknown
Derek Schiavone
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Prepetition 1.25 Lien Lenders and Certain Prepetition 1.5 Lien Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, as 1.25 Lien Administrative Agent and 1.5 Lien Administrative Agent
|
Represented By
|
Unknown
Mike Merkel
Justice Of The Peace, Precinct 3, Pl 1 260 George Street, Suite 100
Alvin, TX 77511 |
1. | SquareTwo Financial Services Corporation Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (wsj.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/20/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |