Scott et al v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02290 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2020 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 14, 2017 4:30 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Company
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Neil Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Scott
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, August 24, 2020 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 08/24 3:45 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE originally filed in Master Case 14-md-2592 as rec doc 17741. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/30/2020.(jeg) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 11:28 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 1:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Pharma AG.(ss) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
6 | 6
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 03/20 12:59 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re4 Summons Submitted for Issuance **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (ss) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Mon 03/20 12:58 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re3 Summons Submitted for Issuance **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (ss) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Mon 03/20 12:43 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Weintraub, Adam) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/20/2017) (ss) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Submitted for Issuance
Mon 03/20 12:39 PM
Summons Submitted for Issuance (Weintraub, Adam) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/20/2017) (ss) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/20 10:04 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
Saturday, March 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 03/18 10:16 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Bayer AG, Bayer Corporation, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. f/k/a Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. f/k/a Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC f/k/a Johnson and Johnson Pharmaceutical Research and Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6032167) filed by Sandra Scott, Neil Scott.Attorney Adam H. Weintraub added to party Neil Scott(pty:pla), Attorney Adam H. Weintraub added to party Sandra Scott(pty:pla).(Weintraub, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |