Swenson v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Co
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Foote |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00417 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Sep 15, 2017 4:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
Lincoln National Life Insurance Co
|
|
Plaintiff
Katheryn Swenson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
58 | 58
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Fri 12/07 2:15 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting56 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 12/7/2018. (crt,Keifer, K) |
|
Thursday, December 06, 2018 | ||
57 | 57
appeal
USCA Judgment
Fri 12/07 9:59 AM
USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE (certified copy) as to53 Notice of Appeal filed by Katheryn Swenson Under FED. R. APP. P. 42(b), the appeal is DISMISSED with prejudice as of December 06, 2018, pursuant to the stipulation of the parties. (USCA 18-30852 (crt,WalkerSld, B) |
|
Wednesday, December 05, 2018 | ||
56 | 56
motion
Dismiss
Wed 12/05 5:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Entire Case by Katheryn Swenson.(aty,Visconte, Wade) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order of Dismissal |