Geer v. Berryhill
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Greg Kays |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00196 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2018 |
Defendant
Nancy A. Berryhill
|
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Lodine Geer
|
GPO
Mar 27 2018
ORDER AFFIRMING THE COMMISSIONER'S DECISION. Signed on 3/27/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) |
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Clerk's Judgment
Tue 03/27 4:02 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (Strodtman, Tracy) |
|
19 | 19
8
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/27 4:01 PM
ORDER AFFIRMING THE COMMISSIONER'S DECISION. Signed on 3/27/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
soc_sec
Social Security reply brief by plaintiff
Fri 01/05 11:13 AM
PLAINTIFFS SOCIAL SECURITY REPLY BRIEF filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Theresa Lodine Geer.(Shine, Cathleen) (Crocker, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 (1/5/2018) Exhibit | ||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
soc_sec
Social Security brief by defendant
Fri 12/15 10:22 AM
DEFENDANTS SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Plaintiff social security reply brief due by 1/5/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Wed 11/15 9:36 AM
ORDER granting15 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. Defendant's social security brief due by December 15, 2017. Signed on November 15, 2017, by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Tue 11/14 10:01 AM
Second MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines up to and including December 15th to file Defendant's BRIEF filed byJeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/28/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Fri 10/20 10:10 AM
ORDER granting13 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. Defendant's social security brief is due on or before November 15, 2017. Signed on October 20, 2017, by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Fri 10/13 1:52 PM
First MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines up to and including November 15th to file Defendant's BRIEF filed byJeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/27/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, September 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
soc_sec
Social Security brief by plaintiff
Mon 09/04 9:53 PM
PLAINTIFFS SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Theresa Lodine Geer. Defendant social security brief due by 10/16/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Mon 08/07 5:41 PM
ORDER granting10 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. Plaintiff's brief is due on or before September 5, 2017. Signed on August 7, 2017, by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Fri 08/04 10:39 AM
MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Theresa Lodine Geer. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/18/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on motion for extension of Social Security deadlines
Wed 06/28 11:53 AM
ORDER granting8 motion for extension of Social Security deadlines. Plaintiff shall have until August 4, 2017, to file the initial brief. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines
Tue 06/27 7:03 PM
MOTION to extend Social Security deadlines filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Theresa Lodine Geer. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/11/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
ssanswer
Answer to Social Security complaint
Thu 05/25 8:28 AM
ANSWER to Social Security complaint filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill. Plaintiffs social security brief due by 7/5/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court (Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
6 | 6
soc_sec
Submission of administrative record
Thu 05/25 8:27 AM
SUBMISSION OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Jeffrey P. Ray on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill.(Attorney Jeffrey P. Ray added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Ray, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 001 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 002 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 006 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 007 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 11 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 12 Medical Records | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
soc_sec
Return of service of Social Security Complaint
Thu 04/06 2:10 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint. United States Attorney General served on 3/30/2017. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
4 | 4
soc_sec
Return of service of Social Security Complaint
Thu 04/06 2:08 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint. Commissioner of Social Security, Office of the Regional Counsel served on 3/28/2017. (Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
sscmp
Complaint - Social Security
Wed 03/22 10:57 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Theresa Lodine Geer. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ifp) filed byCathleen A Shine on behalf of Theresa Lodine Geer. Service due by 6/20/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 03/22 2:02 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Ellis, Lindsey) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/21 5:25 PM
ORDER granting1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed on March 21, 2017, by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Law clerk) |
|
Sunday, March 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Sun 03/19 2:17 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cathleen A Shine on behalf of Theresa Lodine Geer. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/3/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Attorney Cathleen A Shine added to party Theresa Lodine Geer(pty:pla))(Shine, Cathleen) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit |