Pyae Kyaw v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Philip S Gutierrez |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02149 |
Nature of Suit | 462 Immigration - Naturalization Application |
Cause | 08:1447 Denial of Application for Naturalization Hearing |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 14, 2017 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Susan M. Curda
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services USCIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pyae Kyaw
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 05/17 2:50 PM
Effective May 24, 2017, Judge MacKinnon will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 840 on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 840 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Seal Attached PDF Document ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 05/08 3:30 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT - ORDER REMANDING CASE TO UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, PURSUANT TO 8 U.S.C. § 1447(b);ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez, re Stipulation to Remand Case to US Agency8 (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
stip
Remand Case to US Agency
Thu 05/04 5:24 PM
STIPULATION to Remand Case to US Agency United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Pursuant to 8 U.S.C. Section 1447(b) filed by Defendants Susan M. Curda, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services USCIS.(Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party Susan M. Curda(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Ira Lester added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services USCIS(pty:dft))(Lester, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Tue 03/21 4:31 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),2 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be use is: Summons Request - under Category - Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints. The Summons has been issued. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment # 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment # 2 Supplements. It should have been filed and entered separately under its proper event. No further action is required. (et) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 4:21 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Susan M. Curda, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services USCIS. (et) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Seal Attached PDF Document
Tue 03/21 3:41 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT - STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (bm) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Mon 03/20 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 10:21 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) |
|
Saturday, March 18, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Sat 03/18 11:18 AM
SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Pyae Kyaw, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(McMillan, R) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Supplement | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sat 03/18 11:00 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19537340 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Pyae Kyaw. (Attorney R Wayne McMillan added to party Pyae Kyaw(pty:bkmov))(McMillan, R) |