Beth Farrelly v. The United States of America et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | George H Wu |
Referred: | Alexander F Mackinnon |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02150 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 14, 2017 2:18 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
The United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beth Farrelly
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
Tue 11/21 4:19 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Robert Parrish: Mediation held on November 14, 2017, and the case has been completely settled. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Killefer, Gail) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 11/15 1:36 PM
ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu: Based upon the stipulation between the parties and their respective counsel, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Each party will bear its own attorneys' fees and expenses. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (cr) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 11/14 4:48 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by DEFENDANT The United States of America.(Quist, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Wed 09/20 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Robert Parrish has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Fri 09/15 1:15 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that ROBERT PARRIS may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 11/14/2017 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Defendant The United States of America(Quist, Sarah) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Mon 08/07 4:55 PM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULIING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. For reasons stated on the record the Court sets the following dates: Discovery cut-off 12/15/2017. Motions due by 2/8/2018. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 11/20/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 3/8/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Wed 07/19 1:09 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-4 Days, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,.. (Quist, Sarah) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Fri 06/30 3:45 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Beth Farrelly, upon Defendant The United States of America served on 3/22/2017, answer due 6/21/2017; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, served on 3/22/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Sandra R Brown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to David Burroughs. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. (Altholz, Andrew) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/30 3:39 PM
NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Beth Farrelly. Notice of Scheduling Conference (Altholz, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 06/27 1:42 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: On the Court's own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for August 7, 2017, at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than July 24, 2017. See Local Rule 26-1. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (cr) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Correcting Caption
Mon 06/26 2:28 PM
ORDER CORRECTING CAPTION14 by Judge George H. Wu: the caption in this action shall be changed to reflect the substitution of the United States as the defendant for all the common law tort claims against defendant Sandra Jeanette Ramirez. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 06/21 2:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DEFENDANT The United States of America.(Quist, Sarah) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/21 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Substitution filed by DEFENDANT The United States of America.(Quist, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 05/19 3:37 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The United States of America answer now due 6/21/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DEFENDANT The United States of America.(Quist, Sarah) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 05/17 2:50 PM
Effective May 24, 2017, Judge MacKinnon will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 840 on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 840 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 04/25 12:18 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah M S Quist counsel for Defendant The United States of America. Adding Sarah Quist as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT United States of America. (Attorney Sarah M S Quist added to party The United States of America(pty:dft))(Quist, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 04/04 12:18 PM
Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 5:07 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendants Sandra Jeanette Ramirez, The United States of America. (mrgo) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 11:55 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,7 filed by plaintiff Beth Farrelly. (Altholz, Andrew) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Mon 03/20 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request4 . The following error(s) was found: The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 11:15 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 11:15 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et) |
|
Saturday, March 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Sat 03/18 5:43 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Beth Farrelly. (Altholz, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Sat 03/18 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Beth Farrelly, (Altholz, Andrew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Sat 03/18 5:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Beth Farrelly. (Altholz, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sat 03/18 5:37 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19537447 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Beth Farrelly. (Attorney Andrew P Altholz added to party Beth Farrelly(pty:pla))(Altholz, Andrew) |