Melissa Fuller v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00492 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 04, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
judgmentCV
Judgment
Tue 03/05 3:04 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr, in favor of Nancy A. Berryhill against Melissa Fuller Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations,32 . The decision of the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration is affirmed and this action is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou) |
|
32 | 32
order
R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations
Tue 03/05 2:56 PM
ORDER ACCEPTING FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. for Report and Recommendation (Final),31 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Judgment be entered affirming the decision of the Commissioner denying benefits. (sbou) |
|
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Final)
Mon 01/28 3:27 PM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . IT IS RECOMMENDED that the District Judge issue an Order: (1) approving and accepting this Final Report and Recommendation; and (2) directing that Judgment be entered affirming the decision of the Commissioner and dismissing this action with prejudice. (nbo) |
|
Friday, January 11, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
order
Stay Case
Sat 01/12 12:54 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: denying29 APPLICATION to Stay Case (rrey) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Stay Case
Fri 01/11 11:56 PM
APPLICATION to Stay Case filed by defendant United States of America (rrey) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
Leave to File Document
Tue 11/27 2:33 PM
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CORRECTED PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's First Amended Objection to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, be filed. re27 (sbou) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 11/16 6:01 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file A Corrected Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Report And Recommendation Melissa Fuller. (Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Fri 11/16 5:55 PM
OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued),23 First Amended Melissa Fuller.(Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
Thursday, November 15, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendation
Thu 11/15 8:33 PM
OBJECTION to Report and Recommendation (Issued),23 Melissa Fuller.(Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
reportrecommend
Report and Recommendation (Issued)
Fri 10/26 11:46 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick Re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . IT THEREFORE IS RECOMMENDED that the District Judge issue an Order: (1) approving and accepting this Report and Recommendation; and (2) directing that Judgment be entered affirming the decision of the Commissioner and dismissing this action with prejudice. See document for further information. (dv) |
|
22 | 22
reportrecommend
Notice of Report and Recommendation
Fri 10/26 11:43 AM
NOTICE OF FILING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Objections to R&R due by 11/15/2018. (dv) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Declaration
Thu 01/18 6:08 PM
DECLARATION of Jimmy Ewenike for Plaintiff re Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases20 filed by Plaintiff Melissa Fuller.(Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit AHMC MEDICAL RECORDS, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit TREATING PHYSICIAN'S STATEMENT BY DR. HUTAIN | ||
20 | 20
stip
Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases
Thu 01/18 8:04 AM
JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order
Thu 08/24 3:11 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to Submit Plaintiff's Portion of Joint Stipulation to the Commissioner16 . Based upon the parties' Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule, and for cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and including November 30, 2017, to submit Plaintiff's portion of Joint Stipulation to the Commissioner, pursuant to paragraph 5 of the April 7, 2017 (In Chamber) Order re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal (Order). The Commissioner will provide Plaintiff with its portion by January 4, 2018. If desired, Plaintiff will have 14 days to provide an optional reply. The Commissioner will file the Joint Stipulation by January 25, 2018. (dro) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respoth
Administrative Record
Mon 08/21 9:45 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF MELISSA FULLER (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 08/21 9:39 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (mj) filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 08/16 9:45 AM
Corrected STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File For Plaintiff To Submit Her Portion of Joint Stipulation to the Commissioner filed by plaintiff Melissa Fuller.(Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
stip
Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases
Tue 08/15 4:12 PM
First JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by plaintiff Melissa Fuller.(Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 08/15 3:32 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File to submit Plaintiff's settlement statement to the Commissioner filed by plaintiff Melissa Fuller.(Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 07/18 1:40 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Effective Monday, July 31, 2017, Judge Birotte will hear all civil matters on Fridays at 10:00 a.m. Any hearing currently on calendar for Monday, July 31st or later will be heard Friday of the same week. Hearing deadlines in scheduling orders shall be read to reflect the same. Motions filed in the month of July will adhere to the current briefing schedule, with opposition and reply briefs due on Mondays. For any motion filed July 31, 2017, or later (noticed for hearing on Friday, September 1, 2017, or later) the briefing schedule shall adhere to Local Rules 7-9 and 7-10, these deadlines each falling on a Friday in accordance with the new Friday calendar dates: 21 days prior for opposition papers and 14 days prior for reply papers. All Jury Trials will still commence on Tuesdays. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/10 8:58 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF MELISSA FULLER filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (mj) (Marriott, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Tue 04/25 10:42 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Thu 04/20 2:22 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Melissa Fuller, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/17/2017, answer due 8/15/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Kawan. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unclear. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Gina Perez. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Fri 04/07 9:52 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick Re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal. (nbo) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Fri 04/07 9:51 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (nbo) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 04/07 9:49 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick Granting2 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (nbo) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 12:51 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) |
|
Saturday, March 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Summons Request
Sat 03/18 3:18 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Melissa Fuller. (Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Sat 03/18 3:04 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Melissa Fuller. (Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Sat 03/18 3:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Melissa Fuller. (Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Sat 03/18 2:59 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Melissa Fuller. (Ewenike, Jimmy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sat 03/18 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Melissa Fuller. (Attorney Jimmy Ogbonna Ewenike added to party Melissa Fuller(pty:pla))(Ewenike, Jimmy) |