Frommert, et al v. Conkright, et al
Original Case: 6:00-cv-06311
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-00738 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 17, 2019 3:35 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
Sally L. Conkright, Xerox Corporation Pension Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Patricia M. Nazementz, Xerox Corporation Pension Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Xerox Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lawrence M. Becker, Xerox Corporation Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Xerox Corporation Retirement Income Guarantee Plan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Lawrence Becker, Xerox Corporation Plan Administrators
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Patricia M. Nazemetz, Xerox Corporation Pension Plan Administrator
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Paul J. Frommert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Donald S. Foote
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Thomas I. Barnes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ronald J. Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Frank D. Commesso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
William F. Coons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
James D. Gagnier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Brian L. Gaita
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
William J. Ladue
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Gerald A. Leonardo, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Frank Mawdesley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Harold S. Mitchell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Walter J. Petroff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Richard C. Spring
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Patricia M. Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
F. Patricia M. Tobin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Nancy A. Revella
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Anatoli G. Puschkin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
William R. Plummer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Michael J. McCoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Alan H. Clair
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Larry J. Gallagher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Napoleon B. Barbosa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Alexandra Spearman Harrick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Janis A. Edelman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Patricia H. Johnston
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kenneth P. Parnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Joyce D. Cathcart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Floyd Swaim
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Julie A. McMillian
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dennis E. Baines
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ruby Jean Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Matthew D. Alfieri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Irshad Qureshi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Richard C. Crater
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Gail J. Levy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
John A. Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Crystal Thorton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Charles R. Drannbauer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
William M. Burritt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Janice Ross Heiler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Joseph McNeil
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Thomas F. McGee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Vincent G. Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
F. Colt Hitchcock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ronnie Tabak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Martha Lee Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kathy Fay Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mary Beth Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Craig Spencer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Linda S. Bourque
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Thomas Michael Vasta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Frank C. Darling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Clark C. Dingman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Carol E. Gannon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Joseph E. Wright
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
David M. Rohan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
David B. Ruddock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Charles Hobbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Charles Zabinski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Charles J. Maddalozzo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Joyce M. Pruett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
William A. Craven
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Maureen A. Loughlin Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kenneth W. Pietrowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bonnie Cohen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lawrence R. Holland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Gail A. Nasman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Steven D. Barley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Donna S. Lipari
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Andrew C. Matteliano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Michael Horrocks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Candice J. White
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kathleen E. Hunter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
John L. Crisafulli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Deborah J. Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Brenda H. McConnell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kathleen A. Bowen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert P. Caranddo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Terence J. Kurtz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
William J. Cheslock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Thomas E. Dalton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lynn Barnsdale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bruce D. Craig
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Gary P. Hardin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Claudette M. Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dale Platteter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mary Ann Sergeant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Molly White Kehoe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
David K. Young
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Leslie Ann Wunsch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Richard J. Glikin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Eugene H. Updyke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Michael R. Benson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Alvin M. Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Ronnie Kolniak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
James J. Farrell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Robert L. Brackhahn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Benjamin C. Roth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Carmen J. Sofia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kathleen W. Levea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Frederick Scacchitti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Paul Defina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
James G. Walls
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 14 2019
OPINION, affirming the district court judgment, by ALK, JAC, RJL, FILED.[2473988] [17-114, 17-738] |
Docket last updated: 01/17/2019 3:32 AM EST |