David VanValkenburg v. ODOC
Original Case: 3:14-cv-00916
Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-35222 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 25, 2017 1:29 AM PDT |
Defendant - Appellee
OREGON DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVID VANVALKENBURG
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/25/2017 1:26 AM PDT |
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 03/23/2017. First cross appeal brief due 06/19/2017 for Oregon Department of Corrections. Second brief on cross appeal due 07/19/2017 for David VanValkenburg. Third brief on cross appeal due 08/21/2017 for Oregon Department of Corrections. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for David Van Valkenburg is due within 14 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [10359610] 17-35222 17-35203 (RT) [Entered: 03/16/2017 01:56 PM] | |
2 | 2 Filed (ECF) Appellant ODOC Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 03/16/2017. [10360119] 17-35203 --[COURT UPDATE: Spread to case 17-35222 3/17/2017 by TYL] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 03/16/2017 03:56 PM] |