Nilhan Financial, LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert A Mark |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-13320 |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2017 |
Debtor
Nilhan Financial, LLC, Debtor
17885 Collins Ave Apt 4001
Sunny Isles Beach, FL 33160-3178 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Petitioning Creditor
Moffa & Breuer, PLLC, Petitioning Creditor
1776 N Pine Island Rd #102
Plantation, FL 33322 |
Represented By
|
Petitioning Creditor
Moffa & Breuer, PLLC
1776 N Pine Island Rd #102
Plantation, FL 33322 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 07/22/2020 4:36 PM EDT |
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 03/20 3:54 PM
Receipt of Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-13320 [misc,invol7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29468616. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 03/20 3:48 PM
**SEE DE#3 FOR CORRECT PDF.** Chapter 7 Involuntary Petition Re: Nilhan Financial, LLC Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s) Moffa & Breuer, PLLC (attorney John A. Moffa Esq.) (Moffa, John). Modified on 3/21/2017 to edit text . |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 03/20 5:37 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Petitioning Creditor Moffa & Breuer, PLLC. (Moffa, John) |