Progressive Bagging Equipment Company, Inc.
Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert N Opel II |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-01060 |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 27, 2019 |
Debtor
Progressive Bagging Equipment Company, Inc.
357 E Southern Ave
Williamsport, PA 17702-7439 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
228 Walnut Street, Suite 1190
Harrisburg, PA 17101 |
|
Trustee
Lawrence G. Frank (Trustee)
100 Aspen Drive
Dillsburg, PA 17019 |
Docket last updated: 03/21/2017 12:03 AM EDT |
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Mon 03/20 4:01 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(4:17-bk-01060) [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt number 8284035, amount $ 335.00. . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 03/20 3:59 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $ 335.00 Filed by Barry A. Solodky of Nikolaus & Hohenadel, LLP on behalf of Progressive Bagging Equipment Company, Inc.. (Solodky, Barry) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)
Mon 03/20 3:59 PM
Creditor List Uploaded. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by Barry A. Solodky of Nikolaus & Hohenadel, LLP on behalf of Progressive Bagging Equipment Company, Inc. . (Solodky, Barry) |
|
3 | 3
court
Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Mon 03/20 11:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors and Notice of Appointment of Trustee Lawrence G. Frank (Trustee), with 341(a) meeting to be held on 05/17/2017 at 10:00 AM at City Hall, Community Room - 2nd Floor, 245 West 4th Street, Williamsport, PA 17701. (Docketer, Automatic) |