CLARKSON v. MCLAUGHLIN
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie J Abrams |
Referred: | Thomas Q Langstaff |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00061 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order of Transfer/Local Rule 3.4 Statement
Thu 03/30 2:55 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia Macon Divison. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 03/30/2017. (mdm) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer
Thu 03/30 3:14 PM
Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer to Case # 5:17-CV-120. (mdm) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/20 4:30 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (mdm) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Mon 03/20 4:29 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to NICHOLAS C CLARKSON (mdm) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 4:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by NICHOLAS C CLARKSON.Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(mdm) |
|
Att: 1 Trust Account Statement, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 4:24 PM
COMPLAINT against GREGORY MCLAUGHLIN filed by NICHOLAS C CLARKSON.(mdm) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |