CHACON v. SPIVEY et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Clay D Land |
Referred: | Stephen Hyles |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00062 |
Nature of Suit | 463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 5:19 AM EDT |
Notice
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE)
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
FRED SALOMON TOLEDO CHACON
A 209-291-308 STEWART DETENTION CENTER PO BOX 248
LUMPKIN, GA 31815 |
|
Respondent
ICE Asst Director TERESA APPLEGATE
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Secretary DHS JEH C JOHNSON
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Attorney General JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
BILL SPIVEY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 10/19 4:33 PM
Mail Returned -16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Report and Recommendations,17 Judgment sent to PETITIONER returned as undeliverable. (tlp) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Fri 10/06 10:43 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of BILL SPIVEY, JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, JEH C JOHNSON, TERESA APPLEGATE against FRED SALOMON TOLEDO CHACON (tlp) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 10/05 4:29 PM
ORDER finding as moot9 Motion to Dismiss; granting13 Motion to Dismiss; adopting14 Report and Recommendations. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 10/5/2017 (esl) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 10/04 12:30 PM
Mail Returned -14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re9 MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, BILL SPIVEY, TERESA APPLEGATE, JEH C JOHNSON, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE),13 sent to PETITIONER returned as undeliverable. (tlp) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Report and Recommendation
Thu 09/21 10:15 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re9 MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS,13 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9/21/17. (AGH) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Wed 09/20 1:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by TERESA APPLEGATE, JEH C JOHNSON, JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, BILL SPIVEY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE) filed by NICOLE PATRICE GRANT.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(GRANT, NICOLE) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Warrant of Removal/Deportation | ||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 09/18 11:23 AM
Mail Returned - 11 Order, sent to Petitioner returned as undeliverable. (glg) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Thu 09/07 11:26 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER for a status report. Respondents are directed to update the Court regarding Petitioner's current status within fourteen (14) days. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 9/7/17. (AGH) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order for Response to Motion
Tue 04/25 10:09 AM
ORDER for Response to Motion re:9 MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, BILL SPIVEY, TERESA APPLEGATE, JEH C JOHNSON, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE). Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4/25/17. (AGH) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Tue 04/25 9:32 AM
MOTION to Dismiss PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by TERESA APPLEGATE, JEH C JOHNSON, JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, BILL SPIVEY, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NOTICE) filed by NICOLE PATRICE GRANT.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(GRANT, NICOLE) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Form I-213, Record of Deportable/Inadmissible Alien, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Form I-860, Notice and Order of Expedited Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Form I-862, Notice to Appear, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Order of the Immigration Judge Re: Custody, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Deportation Officer Declaration, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Decision of the Board of Immigration Appeals | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Wed 03/29 4:35 PM
ORDER setting briefing schedule re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FRED SALOMON TOLEDO CHACON. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3/29/17. (AGH) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respoth
Return Response (28:2241)
Mon 03/27 5:39 PM
RETURN RESPONSE re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by TERESA APPLEGATE, JEH C JOHNSON, JEFFERSON B SESSIONS, III, BILL SPIVEY(GRANT, NICOLE) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Form I-213, Record of Deportable/Inadmissible Alien, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Form I-860, Notice and Order of Expedited Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Form I-862, Notice to Appear, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Order of the Immigration Judge, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - D.O. Declaration | ||
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Form I-213, Record of Deportable/Inadmissible Alien, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Form I-860, Notice and Order of Expedited Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Form I-862, Notice to Appear, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Order of the Immigration Judge, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - D.O. Declaration | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 03/27 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by NICOLE PATRICE GRANT on behalf of All Defendants (GRANT, NICOLE) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order for Response (Habeas Petition)
Wed 03/22 11:41 AM
ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by FRED SOLOMON TOLEDO CHACON. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 3/22/17. (AGH) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Mon 03/20 3:05 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to FRED SOLOMON TOLEDO CHACON (tlp) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/20 3:04 PM
PLEASE DISREGARD - DUPLICATE ENTRY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/20 3:03 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tlp) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 03/20 3:02 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ,filed by FRED SOLOMON TOLEDO CHACON. ( Filing fee $ 5 Receipt number 41611.)(tlp) |
|
Att: 1 Immigration Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |