DOUGLAS v. TAYLOR
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marc Thomas Treadwell |
Referred: | Stephen Hyles |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00103 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 19, 2017 |
Petitioner
MICKEY DOUGLAS
|
|
Respondent
CEDRIC TAYLOR
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Thu 10/19 10:09 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of CEDRIC TAYLOR against MICKEY DOUGLAS (ans) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 10/18 3:49 PM
ORDER ADOPTING as amended9 Report and Recommendations. Douglas's § 2254 petition is DENIED, and a certificate of appealability is DENIED. Any motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 10/18/2017. (tlh) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Report and Recommendation
Fri 07/21 11:46 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by MICKEY DOUGLAS. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 7/21/2017. (efw) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/15 1:04 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibts 1 through 3 by CEDRIC TAYLOR(CROWDER, MATTHEW) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - a copy of Petitioners state habeas petition filed on May 23, 2016., | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2a - a copy of volume 1 of 2 of Petitioners state habeas hearing transcript from August 31, 2016., | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2b - a copy of volume 2 of 2 of Petitioners state habeas hearing transcript from August 31, 2016., | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - a copy of the state habeas courts final order denying relief filed on December 19, 2016. | ||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Fri 06/09 3:04 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by CEDRIC TAYLOR.(CROWDER, MATTHEW) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Answer-Response | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 06/08 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of CEDRIC TAYLOR Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party CEDRIC TAYLOR(pty:res) (SMITH, PAULA) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 06/08 12:35 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MATTHEW BLACKWELL CROWDER on behalf of CEDRIC TAYLOR Attorney MATTHEW BLACKWELL CROWDER added to party CEDRIC TAYLOR(pty:res) (CROWDER, MATTHEW) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/14 10:35 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. ORDER for Petitioner to amend and for Respondent to file an answer. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEPHEN HYLES on 4/14/2017 (efw) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/20 3:45 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (ans) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 3:44 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by MICKEY DOUGLAS.. Motion(s) referred to STEPHEN HYLES.(ans) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 03/20 3:44 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by MICKEY DOUGLAS.(ans) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |