BRISCOE v. DAVIS
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Leslie J Abrams |
Referred: | Charles H Weigle |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00104 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 18 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 05/04 9:05 AM
Mail Returned -6 Order,7 Judgment sent to Jerry Tyrone Briscoe returned as undeliverable. (bcl) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Tue 04/25 1:39 PM
JUDGMENT of dismissal. (bcl) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 04/25 11:33 AM
ORDER dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 4/20/2017. (bcl) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/25/2017) (bcl) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 03/27 1:17 PM
Mail Returned -4 Consent to Proceed Form Sent filed by JERRY TYRONE BRISCOE,3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge sent to Jerry Tyrone Briscoe returned as undeliverable. (bcl) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Mon 03/20 3:43 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JERRY TYRONE BRISCOE (bcl) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/20 3:43 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (bcl) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 3:41 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by JERRY TYRONE BRISCOE.. Motion(s) referred to CHARLES H WEIGLE.(bcl) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT against DAVID DAVIS, filed by JERRY TYRONE BRISCOE.(bcl) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |