PINKNEY v. BENDER et al
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Hugh Lawson |
Referred: | Thomas Q Langstaff |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-00047 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2018 |
Defendant
BETH C GREENE
|
|
Defendant
BRIAN CHILDRESS
|
|
Defendant
CHRIS PRINE
|
|
Defendant
JAMES W HALL
|
|
Defendant
JENNIFER WILLIAMS
|
|
Defendant
JOHN KENT EDWARDS JR
|
|
Defendant
JUSTO C CABRAL III
|
|
Defendant
PCHEAL
|
|
Defendant
VERNITA LEE BENDER
|
|
Plaintiff
ELLIOTT PINKNEY JR
|
GPO
Nov 21 2023
***DISREGARD FILED IN WRONG CASE****JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. (ksl) Modified text on 11/21/2023 (ksl). |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment - Attorney Fees
Tue 11/21 8:59 AM
***DISREGARD FILED IN WRONG CASE**** JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees . (ksl) Modified text on 11/21/2023 (ksl) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Judgment
Tue 01/30 2:24 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing the case. (sbd) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
3
pgs
order
Order
Mon 01/29 4:52 PM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 1/29/2018. (aks) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 12/11 2:09 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directed to Plaintiff. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 12/11/2017. (TQL) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint
Mon 09/25 11:24 AM
ORDER for Plaintiff to Recast his Complaint. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 9/25/2017. (TQL) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Response to Court Order
Thu 08/31 1:23 PM
RESPONSE to Court Order filed by ELLIOTT PINKNEY, JR re9 Order to Show Cause.(sbd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 08/14 4:25 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directed to Plaintiff. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 8/14/2017. (TQL) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/06 3:16 PM
ORDER for Plaintiff to Recast Complaint using the standard form, ORDER granting2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and ORDER striking two Answers as premature. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 7/6/2017. (TQL) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/16 3:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by JENNIFER WILLIAMS.(PETERMAN, JODY)Attorney JODY DONALD PETERMAN added to party JENNIFER WILLIAMS(pty:dft) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/09 3:47 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by VERNITA LEE BENDER, BRIAN CHILDRESS.(TANNER, TIMOTHY)Attorney TIMOTHY M TANNER added to party VERNITA LEE BENDER(pty:dft), Attorney TIMOTHY M TANNER added to party BRIAN CHILDRESS(pty:dft) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Mon 03/20 1:35 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to ELLIOTT PINKNEY, JR. (sbd) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/20 1:34 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Langstaff issued at the direction of the Court. (sbd) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 1:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by ELLIOTT PINKNEY, JR. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(sbd) |
|
Att: 1 Trust Account Statement | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by ELLIOTT PINKNEY, JR.(sbd) |
|
Att: 1 Lowndes County State Court documents, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit |