Chapman v. Roundtree
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Randal Hall |
Referred: | Brian K Epps |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00033 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 07/12 11:40 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered in accordance with the Court's11 Order. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 07/12/2017. (thb) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Report and Recommendations
Wed 07/12 11:36 AM
ORDER adopting8 Report and Recommendations, dismissing this case without prejudice, and closing this civil action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 07/12/2017. (thb) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respoth
Response
Wed 07/05 4:34 PM
RESPONSE to8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Joshua Arie Chapman. (pts) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Fri 06/23 3:03 PM
ORDER directing service of the8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/23/2017. (thb) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/23 2:59 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint, that this case be dismissed without prejudice and that this civil action be closed Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/23/2017. (thb) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 05/17 1:10 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's custodian shall set aside twenty percent (20%) of all deposits to Plaintiff's trust fund account and forward those funds to the Clerk each time the set aside amount exceeds $10.00 until the $350.00 filing fee has been paid in full. All payments shall be designated as made in payment of the filing fee for Civil Action No. CV117-033. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve this Order on Plaintiff and Plaintiff's custodian. The Court Orders Plaintiff to amend his complaint within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Amended Complaint due by 5/31/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/17/2017. (thb) (thb) |
|
Att: 1 (5/17/2017) Blank | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Collection of Fees
Mon 05/15 11:21 AM
CONSENT by Prisoner Joshua Arie Chapman to collection of fees. (thb) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Mon 05/15 11:20 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Joshua Arie Chapman. (thb) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 04/19 11:10 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, and directing the Clerk to update the list of Defendants on the docket in accordance with the caption of this Order. Plaintiff is directed to complete and return the enclosed Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to respond to this Order within thirty days, the Court will presume that Plaintiff desires to have this case voluntarily dismissed and will dismiss this action, without prejudice. PLRA due by 5/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/19/2017. (thb) |
|
Att: 1 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account | ||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 04/18 2:36 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua Arie Chapman. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(cmr) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 03/20 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency re1 Complaint. (Compliance due by 4/10/2017.) (jlm) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 11:20 AM
COMPLAINT against Richard Roundtree, filed by Joshua Arie Chapman.(jlm) |