Johnson v. United States of America
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William T Moore, Jr |
Referred: | G R Smith |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00055 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 09/05 4:57 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to25 Notice of Appeal filed by Antonio Franklin Johnson. Motion for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Antonio Franklin Johnson is DENIED. Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Antonio Franklin Johnson is DENIED as MOOT. (jrb) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 07/09 3:25 PM
USCA Case Number 18-12794 for25 Notice of Appeal filed by Antonio Franklin Johnson. (jrb) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 07/02 3:08 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:25 Notice of Appeal Other Appeals: Yes, Judge Appealed: William T. Moore, Jr., Fee Paid: No, Pending COA/IFP: No. (jrb) |
|
25 | 25
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Mon 07/02 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to24 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Antonio Franklin Johnson. (jrb) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/04 4:24 PM
ORDER denying20 Motion to reopen. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/4/18. (wwp) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 05/11 3:26 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION filed by Antonio Franklin Johnson. (evs) |
|
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/27 8:59 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION filed by United States of America. (Tanner, R.) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/16 2:13 PM
MOTION to Reopen to Fed.R.CIV.P Rule 60(b) by Antonio Franklin Johnson. Responses due by 4/30/2018. (jrb) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 02/13 2:10 PM
ORDER of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by Antonio Franklin Johnson. Motion for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Antonio Franklin Johnson is DENIED. Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Antonio Franklin Johnson is DENIED as MOOT. (jrb) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 10/30 8:30 AM
USCA Case Number 17-14760 K for16 Notice of Appeal filed by Antonio Franklin Johnson. (jlm) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 10/25 2:36 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:16 Notice of Appeal, Other Appeals: No, Judge Appealed:William T. Moore, Jr., Fee Paid: No, Pending COA/IFP: No. (jrb) |
|
16 | 16
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Wed 10/25 1:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to14 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, by Antonio Franklin Johnson. (jrb) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 09/29 1:28 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT denying the 28 U.S.C. 2255 Petition. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (jrb) |
|
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Fri 09/29 1:22 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for10 Report and Recommendations. Petitioner's 28 U.S.C. 2255 Petition is denied. In addition, Petitioner is not entitled to a Certificate of Appealability, rendering moot any request for in forma pauperis on appeal. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore on 9/29/17. (jrb) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Thu 09/14 3:01 PM
OBJECTION to10 Report and Recommendations by Antonio Franklin Johnson. (jrb) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 08/25 9:48 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Objections to R&R due by 9/23/2017. (jrb) |
||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 08/25 9:47 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to file Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations. Objections due on September 23, 2017. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/24/17. (jrb) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 08/21 2:38 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to file objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations by Antonio Franklin Johnson. Responses due by 9/5/2017. (jrb) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendations
Thu 08/10 1:38 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Denying re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Antonio Franklin Johnson. Objections to R&R due by 8/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/10/17. (jrb) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Response
Mon 06/26 10:59 AM
Reply to6 Response to1 Motion to vacate filed by United States of America filed by Antonio Franklin Johnson. (wwp) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/08 4:45 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 6/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/8/17. (jlm) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/01 11:55 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to6 Response by Antonio Franklin Johnson. Responses due by 6/15/2017. REFERRED to Judge G. R. Smith.(jrb) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
respoth
Response
Wed 05/17 8:27 AM
RESPONSE to1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Antonio Franklin Johnson,2 filed by Antonio Franklin Johnson by United States of America. (Tanner, R.) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 04/19 1:40 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Responses due by 5/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/19/17. (jrb) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 04/18 3:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by United States of America. Responses due by 5/2/2017. (Knoche, Karl) |
|
utility
Motions Referred
Tue 04/18 3:14 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (loh) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/22 3:13 PM
ORDER re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Antonio Franklin Johnson. The Court DIRECTS the Government to respond within thirty days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/22/17. (jlm) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Brief
Mon 03/20 12:25 PM
MEMORANDUM of Law re1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Antonio Franklin Johnson. (jlm) |
|
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Mon 03/20 12:23 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Antonio Franklin Johnson. Responses due by 4/3/2017.(jlm) |