Purvis v. Wal-Mart Stores East Inc.
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Theresa L Springmann |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00102 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 5:24 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Richard C Kraege
Goodin Abernathy & Miller LLP 8900 Keystone Crossing Suite 1100
Indianapolis, IN 46240 |
|
Plaintiff
Nakita Purvis
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East Inc
Terminated: 03/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores Inc
Terminated: 03/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
misc
Costs Taxed - form will be generated
Wed 04/24 11:23 AM
Pursuant to *37 Notice that Costs will be Taxed by Clerk *, Costs are hereby taxed in the amount of $ *893.45* against *Nakita Purvis*. (ksp) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
notice
Notice that Costs will be Taxed by Clerk - form will be generated
Wed 04/10 9:35 AM
Pursuant to *36 Bill of Costs filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP *, costs in the amount of $ *893.45* will be taxed by the Clerk on *4/24/2019*. (ksp) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Bill of Costs
Tue 04/09 4:32 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Zoeller, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Itemization with Receipt | ||
Tuesday, March 26, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Clerks Judgment
Tue 03/26 3:13 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (ksp) |
|
34 | 34
9
pgs
order
Opinion and Order Terminate Civil Case
Tue 03/26 3:12 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF 26) as to the Plaintiff's claim for interference under the Family and Medical Leave Act. The Clerk will enter judgment in favor of the Defendant and against the Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 3/26/19. (ksp) |
|
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
Tue 01/22 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information for Leeann Simpkins (Simpkins, Leeann) |
|
Wednesday, December 26, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
Wed 12/26 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information for Susan M. Zoeller (Zoeller, Susan) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 08/23 9:53 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Zoeller, Susan) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Supplement
Thu 08/09 2:53 PM
SUPPLEMENT to29 Response to Motion Designation of Evidence filed by Nakita Purvis.(Jones, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from the Deposition of Nakita Purvis, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Nakita Purvis Deposition Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Nakita Purvis Deposition Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Nakita Purvis Deposition Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Nakita Purvis Deposition Exhibit 20 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 08/09 2:49 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nakita Purvis. (Jones, Andrew) |
|
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Supplement
Mon 07/09 11:35 PM
SUPPLEMENT to27 Brief in Support,26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Zoeller, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Deposition Excerpts | ||
27 | 27
respm
Brief in Support
Mon 07/09 11:16 PM
BRIEF in Support of26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Zoeller, Susan) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 07/09 11:14 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Zoeller, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 05/02 3:59 PM
ORDER FOR CHIEF JUDGE THERESA L SPRINGMANN: Dispositive motions to be filed by 7/9/2018 and to be briefed in accordance with Local District Rules pursuant to the 24 Bright Line Notice. In the alternative, parties may jointly request trial date by written notice on or before 6/4/2018. (jjj) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Bright Line Notice
Tue 05/01 12:24 PM
NOTICE: Because the discovery period in this case has now concluded and there are no pending non-dispositive motions, the referral to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins is now terminated. All further matters will now be handled by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann unless otherwise directed. This entry constitutes the court's order on this matter and shall carry the same weight and authority as a written order signed by the judge. (mr) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 02/08 9:34 AM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Dft's22 Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline for the Purpose of Completing Pla's Deposition is GRANTED. Discovery deadline is extended to 4/30/2018. Text entry order. (lns) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 02/07 11:13 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Purpose of Taking Plaintiff's Deposition by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Zoeller, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 11/28 3:37 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins:20 Dft's Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline is granted. Discovery deadline extended to 2/27/2018. Text entry order. (mr) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 11/22 3:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (UNOPPOSED) by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Zoeller, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 11/15 8:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leeann P Simpkins on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Simpkins, Leeann) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 08/23 3:55 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The17 Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance is granted. The appearance of Attorney Kimberli A. Williams is hereby withdrawn on behalf of Dft. Text entry order.(mr) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 08/23 1:45 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Williams, Kimberli) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Fri 06/02 11:45 AM
OPINION AND ORDER denying with leave to refile15 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/2/17. (nal) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Protective Order
Wed 05/24 3:57 PM
MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East Inc, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores Inc.(Zoeller, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Stipulated Protective Order | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 9:43 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann for all further proceedings. Judge Jon E DeGuilio no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/2017. (rmc) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs
Mon 05/01 1:54 PM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 4/26/2017 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Andrew Jones. Dft appeared by atty Susan Zoeller. The12 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 12/29/2017. All further dates and deadlines are to be set by the District Judge. Richard Kraege appointed as Mediator. Atty Zoeller to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Jones. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/17/2017. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Tue 04/25 9:55 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zoeller, Susan) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 04/13 4:22 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Zoeller, Susan) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Fri 03/31 2:10 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (mr) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing/Deadlines
Fri 03/31 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2017 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/30 10:42 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, filed by Nakita Purvis.(Jones, Andrew) |
|
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 03/30 11:07 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Nakita Purvis.(Jones, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/29 12:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberli A Williams on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Williams, Kimberli) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 03/29 12:28 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Stores Inc for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc... (Zoeller, Susan) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/29 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M Zoeller on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Zoeller, Susan) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 12:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/20 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew G Jones on behalf of Nakita Purvis (Jones, Andrew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 11:12 AM
COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3198805.), filed by Nakita Purvis.(Jones, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 03/20 12:21 PM
Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal) |