Jones v. Wright(MAG+)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | William Keith Watkins |
Referred: | Gray M Borden |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00153 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 13, 2017 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Darby Wright
|
|
Plaintiff
Lee Roy Jones
820 Roosevelt Street
Greenville, AL 36037 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Leeroy James
Terminated: 04/25/2017
820 Roosevelt St.
Greenville, AL 36037 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/28 4:23 PM
NOTICE to the Court by Lee Roy Jones. (dmn, ) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Judgment
Fri 07/07 12:30 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: It is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to FRCP 58. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/7/2017.(dmn, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Appeals Checklist | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 07/07 12:27 PM
ORDER that the 10 Recommendation is ADOPTED, and that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. A separate final judgment will be entered. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/7/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Wed 07/05 10:35 AM
NO OBJECTIONS filed to10 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 06/05 11:32 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE that Plaintiff Lee Roy Jones'1 Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with the orders of the court. Objections to R&R due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 6/5/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Response to Order
Tue 05/23 12:42 PM
Response to8 Order, by Lee Roy Jones. (dmn, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order
Tue 05/09 3:53 PM
ORDER that Jones' responsive filing (Doc.7 ) be STRICKEN from the record as further set out in the order. However, since Jones is a pro se party, the court will give Jones a final opportunity to file an amended complaint, on or before 5/24/2017, that complies with the directives of the court's prior orders, the Local Rules of this court, and the court's General Standing Orders, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as further set out in the order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 5/9/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Response to Order
Tue 05/02 11:48 AM
Response to6 Order, by Lee Roy Jones. (dmn, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 04/25 12:21 PM
ORDER: Before the court is pro se Plaintiff Leeroy James5 Motion for a New Court Date. It is ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff seeks to have his name changed in the style of the case from Leeroy James to Lee Roy Jones, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to take the appropriate steps to effectuate this change. It is unclear to the court what new court date Plaintiff is requesting. On 3/31/2017, Plaintiff was ordered to file an amended complaint no later than 4/14/2017. Plaintiff did not file an amended complaint by that deadline, and Plaintiffs motion for a new court date was filed on 4/24/2017, well after his 4/17/2017 deadline to amend his complaint. Nevertheless, because Plaintiff is a pro se litigant, the court will grant him one final opportunity to amend his complaint to comply with the directives setforth in the courts 3/31/2017 order. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion (Doc.5 ) is GRANTED to the extent he requests an extension of time to file an amended complaint, and Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies outlined in the courts 3/31/2017 order no later than 5/5/2017. Finally, the court notes that Plaintiffs motion was submitted in a format that already included the courts electronic filing information at the top of the page. Plaintiff is instructed not to file documents with the court that already include an electronic filing stamp at the top of the page, as each new filing will receive its own electronic filing stamp upon being docketed by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 4/25/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Amend/Correct Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 04/24 5:04 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint to Correct Name in System to Lee Roy Jones, MOTION for a New Court Date by Leeroy James. (dmn, ) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 03/31 11:48 AM
ORDER GRANTING2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; STAYING service of the complaint, as further set out in order; directing that James file an amended comlaint on or before 4/14/2017 that cures the deficiencies noted in this order, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden on 3/31/17. (djy, ) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/20 3:32 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge Gray M. Borden for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Chief Judge William Keith Watkins on 3/20/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 9:54 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leeroy James.(dmn, ) |
|
Att: 1 Application to Proceed IFP | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 9:53 AM
COMPLAINT against Darby Wright, filed by Leeroy James.(dmn, ) |