DeLeon v. Madigan
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Darrow |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01119 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
misc
Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Fri 09/01 10:47 AM
Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 8/28/17, in the amount of $ 1.29; receipt number 44626002837 (KB, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Thu 06/01 3:51 PM
Letter to the Court dated 5/29/17 from plaintiff (SKR, ilcd) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Judgment
Thu 05/11 1:31 PM
JUDGMENT entered. (ED, ilcd) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Prisoner Merit Review Opinion
Mon 05/08 2:20 PM
MERIT REVIEW OPINION Entered by Judge Sara Darrow on 5/8/2017. See written Order. Plaintiffs complaints are dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. The cases are closed.(ED, ilcd) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
minutes
Merit Review Hearing
Fri 04/28 1:28 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held 4/28/17 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Merit Review Hearing held. Allegations of the complaint discussed. Written order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C 10:26 AM.) (SKR, ilcd) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Video Writ Issued
Thu 04/06 12:01 PM
VIDEO WRIT issued for the merit review hearing on April 28, 2017, at 10:15 a.m. (LN, ilcd) |
|
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 04/06 11:56 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 4/5/17. A merit review hearing is set for April 28, 2017, at 10:15 a.m., by video conference from Urbana. The clerk is directed to issue the appropriate writ to insure plaintiff's appearance at this merit review hearing. (LN, ilcd) |
||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
misc
Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received
Wed 03/29 3:50 PM
Prisoner Initial Partial Filing Fee received 3/29/2017, in the amount of $5.33; receipt number 44626002659. (LN, ilcd) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger
Mon 03/20 4:45 PM
+++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (LN, ilcd) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 4:45 PM
PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Richard DeLeon, Jr.(LN, ilcd) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Opening
Mon 03/20 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 211 19th Street, Rock Island, IL 61201.Merit Review Deadline set for 4/10/2017.(LN, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 4:43 PM
COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Richard DeLeon, Jr. (LN, ilcd) |
|
order
Order on Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 4:47 PM
TEXT ORDER - Entered by Judge Sara Darrow on 3/20/2017 granting3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $5.33. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (LN, ilcd) |