O'Neil et al v. Monsanto Company
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Colin Stirling Bruce |
Referred: | Eric I Long |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02060 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 02, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 5:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Linda O'Neil
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin O'Neil
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark
Tue 06/13 11:21 AM
Remark: Case transferred from Illinois Central has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:17-cv-03378, filed 06/12/2017. (KM, ilcd) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Transfer Order by MDL Panel Clerk
Fri 06/02 10:14 AM
Conditional Transfer Order entered by Clerk, MDL Panel, transferring this case to the Northern District of California. This case is terminated. (TK, ilcd) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
MDL Remark
Thu 06/01 8:55 AM
MDL Remark: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-21) - 7 action(s) re: pldg. (1 in CAS/3:16-cv-02275, 1 in ILC/2:17-cv-02060, 1 in ILS/3:17-cv-00293, 190 in MDL No. 2741, 1 in NCE/7:17-cv-00088, 1 in NE/8:17-cv-00088, 1 in OHN/1:17-cv-00577, 1 in WIW/3:17-cv-00223) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 6/1/2017.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741, CAS/3:16-cv-02275, ILC/2:17-cv-02060, ILS/3:17-cv-00293, NCE/7:17-cv-00088, NE/8:17-cv-00088, OHN/1:17-cv-00577, WIW/3:17-cv-00223 (TLL) (TK, ilcd) |
|
misc
MDL Remark
Thu 06/01 8:54 AM
MDL Remark: MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-21) Finalized on 6/1/17. Please see pleading (3 in CAS/3:16-cv-02275, 3 in ILC/2:17-cv-02060, 3 in ILS/3:17-cv-00293, 198 in MDL No. 2741, 3 in NCE/7:17-cv-00088, 3 in NE/8:17-cv-00088, 3 in OHN/1:17-cv-00577, 3 in WIW/3:17-cv-00223).As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer.The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. California for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 6/1/2017.Associated Cases: MDL No. 2741, CAS/3:16-cv-02275, ILC/2:17-cv-02060, ILS/3:17-cv-00293, NCE/7:17-cv-00088, NE/8:17-cv-00088, OHN/1:17-cv-00577, WIW/3:17-cv-00223 (TLL) (TK, ilcd) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 05/08 10:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda O'Neil, Marvin O'Neil. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 4/14/2017, answer due 6/13/2017. (O'Brien, James) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 3:02 PM
Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (KE, ilcd) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Attorney Complaint
Mon 03/20 2:04 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2532543.), filed by Linda O'Neil, Marvin O'Neil.(O'Brien, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |