Brown v. United States of America
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Colin Stirling Bruce |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02063 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, June 14, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Fri 06/14 11:30 AM
Letter from Edward C. Brown, Jr. requesting copy of transcript in criminal proceedings in Case No. 15-20008 and copy of 2255 motion in Case No. 17-2063 (Clerk forwarded letter requesting transcript to court reporter LC and docketed letter in Case Nos. 15-20008 and 17-2063 and sent a copy of the 2255 motion1 to Edward C. Brown, Jr. at FCI Elkton.). (TC, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Judgment
Thu 08/17 4:16 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Edward Brown (JMB, ilcd) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Thu 08/17 12:07 PM
ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 8/17/2017. Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence Under 28 U.S.C. section 22551 is DENIED. A Certificate of appealability is DENIED. This case is terminated. See written order. (JMB, ilcd) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
respm
Response to Motion/Petition
Fri 05/26 1:37 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) and Motion to Dismiss filed by Respondent United States of America. (Peirson, Elham) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 03/27 9:53 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 3/27/2017. The Government has until 5/26/2017 to file a Response to Petitioner's1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255). (DS, ilcd) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Remark
Mon 03/20 2:59 PM
Remark: Criminal Indictment and Judgment and commitment order. See criminal case 15-20008 (DS, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Judgment | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Mon 03/20 2:51 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Edward Brown.(DS, ilcd) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |