Central Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. KP Construction Inc.
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sue E Myerscough |
Referred: | Eric I Long |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03079 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1145 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:36 AM CDT |
Defendant
KP Construction Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Central Laborers' Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Illinois Laborers' & Contractors Training Program
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laborers' Local 393
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Market Preservation Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central Illinois Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central Illinois Legislative League
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central Laborers' of Illinois Vacation Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation & Education Trust
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Northern Illinois Annuity Fund
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Northern Illinois Welfare Fund
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, January 23, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance of Attorney
Thu 01/23 8:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John P Leahy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Leahy, John) |
|
minutes
Citation to Discover Assets Hearing
Thu 01/23 1:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held 1/23/20 before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Appearance on behalf of plaintiff by John Leahy. Appearance on behalf of defendant by Penelope Pollack. Citation to Discover Assets Hearing held. Defendant sworn and questioned. Citation is discharged. (Tape #UR-B 10:00 AM.) (SKR, ilcd) |
||
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 12/09 3:43 PM
NOTICE Hearing re Order,, Set/Reset Hearings, (Shrake, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2019 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 12/05 3:18 PM
TEXT ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/5/19. Upon request of Plaintiff, the Citation Hearing scheduled for 11:30 AM on 12/12/2019 is rescheduled to 1/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long.(SKR, ilcd) |
||
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 11/19 4:12 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Citation to Discover Assets served on KP Construction Inc. c/o Penelope Pollack on 11/07/2019, filed by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Illinois Laborers' & Contractors Training Program, Laborers' Local 393, Market Preservation Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, North Central Illinois Legislative League, North Central Laborers' of Illinois Vacation Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation & Education Trust, North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, Northern Illinois Annuity Fund, Northern Illinois Welfare Fund. (Shrake, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, October 30, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Citation to Discover Assets
Wed 10/30 3:56 PM
Citation to Discover Assets issued and returned to attorney(s) for service. Citation Hearing set for 12/12/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. (MAS, ilcd) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Judgment
Mon 06/19 2:35 PM
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Court's Order awarding default judgment for the Plaintiff and against the Defendant. (MAS, ilcd) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Mon 06/19 12:27 PM
ORDER entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 6/16/2017. The Plaintiffs' Motion, d/e7 made pursuant to Rule 55(b)(2) is GRANTED. The Court awards Default Judgment for Plaintiffs and against Defendant. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER) (MAS, ilcd) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 05/10 9:04 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Illinois Laborers' & Contractors Training Program, Laborers' Local 393, Market Preservation Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, North Central Illinois Legislative League, North Central Laborers' of Illinois Vacation Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation & Education Trust, North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, Northern Illinois Annuity Fund, Northern Illinois Welfare Fund. Responses due by 5/24/2017(Shrake, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 04/26 9:22 AM
ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 4/26/17 granting5 Motion for Entry of Default. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. ( Motions due by 5/10/2017.) (SKR, ilcd) |
|
order
Entry of Default
Wed 04/26 9:24 AM
ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to KP Construction Inc. Entered by the clerk on 4/26/17. (SKR, ilcd) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Entry of Default
Mon 04/24 10:50 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiffs Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Illinois Laborers' & Contractors Training Program, Laborers' Local 393, Market Preservation Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, North Central Illinois Legislative League, North Central Laborers' of Illinois Vacation Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation & Education Trust, North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, Northern Illinois Annuity Fund, Northern Illinois Welfare Fund. Responses due by 5/8/2017(Shrake, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer)
Tue 04/11 2:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, Laborers' Local 393, Northern Illinois Welfare Fund, North Central Illinois Legislative League, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation & Education Trust, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Market Preservation Fund, Northern Illinois Annuity Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, North Central Laborers' of Illinois Vacation Fund, Illinois Laborers' & Contractors Training Program. KP Construction Inc. served on 3/31/2017, answer due 4/21/2017. (Shrake, Timothy) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 4:58 PM
Summons Issued as to KP Construction Inc. and forwarded to the Plaintiffs' attorney for effectuation of service. (MAS, ilcd) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
order
Order
Tue 03/21 3:31 PM
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Judge Schanzle-Haskins disqualifies himself and recuses himself from participation in this matter pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(b)(4). Pursuant to instructions from Chief Judge James E. Shadid, this matter is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Eric Long. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 3/21/2017. (MAS, ilcd) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 03/21 3:33 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins no longer assigned to the case. (MAS, ilcd) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate of Interest
Mon 03/20 1:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Illinois Laborers' & Contractors Training Program, Laborers' Local 393, Market Preservation Fund, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, North Central Illinois Legislative League, North Central Laborers' of Illinois Vacation Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation & Education Trust, North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, Northern Illinois Annuity Fund, Northern Illinois Welfare Fund. (Shrake, Timothy) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Attorney Complaint
Mon 03/20 1:31 PM
COMPLAINT against KP Construction Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2532495.), filed by North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, Laborers' Local 393, Northern Illinois Welfare Fund, North Central Illinois Legislative League, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation & Education Trust, North Central Illinois Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Market Preservation Fund, Northern Illinois Annuity Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, North Central Laborers' of Illinois Vacation Fund, Illinois Laborers' & Contractors Training Program.(Shrake, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Summons |