United States of America v. Bias et al
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | John W Lungstrum |
Referred: | James P O'Hara |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02164 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 28:2201 Injunction |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:43 AM CDT |
Defendant
Everett Bias
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Integrity Solutions Tax Consultants, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement
Tue 07/18 9:32 AM
STATEMENT re8 Judgment,7 Judgment Defendant's Sworn Statement by Defendants Everett Bias, Integrity Solutions Tax Consultants, Inc.. (Cornwell, Carl) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Tue 04/25 4:26 PM
ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST INTEGRITY SOLUTIONS TAX CONSULTANTS, INC. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 4/25/2017. (ydm) |
|
7 | 7
order
Judgment
Tue 04/25 4:24 PM
ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST EVERETT BIAS Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 4/25/2017. (ydm) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Tue 04/25 8:52 AM
STIPULATION for Entry of Order and Judgment of Permanent Injunction Against Integrity Solutions Tax Consultants, Inc. by United States of America. (Wiesner, Jared) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Tue 04/25 8:51 AM
STIPULATION for Entry of Order and Judgment of Permanent Injunction Against Everett Bias by United States of America. (Wiesner, Jared) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Entry of Appearance
Wed 03/29 10:51 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Carl E. Cornwell, II on behalf of All Defendants (Cornwell, Carl) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Reassigning Case
Tue 03/28 2:16 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum for all further proceedings. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 03/28/2017. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Designation of Place of Trial
Mon 03/20 10:47 AM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff United States of America - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Wiesner, Jared) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (attorney)
Mon 03/20 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by United States of America.(Wiesner, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 03/20 11:31 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cv) |
||
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 11:43 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Everett Bias, Integrity Solutions Tax Consultants, Inc.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (cv) |