Recasner v. Tanner et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carl Barbier |
Referred: | Daniel E Knowles, III |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02220 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2018 |
Defendant
Robert Tanner
|
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Recasner
|
|
Respondent
Attorney General State of Louisiana
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 11/07 4:11 PM
ORDER of USCA as to14 Notice of Appeal. Under 5TH CIR. R. 42.3, the appeal is dismissed as of October 25, 2018, for want of prosecution. The appellant failed to timely comply with certificate of appealability requirements and to pay the fee.(cg) |
|
Att: 1 Letter | ||
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/06 11:37 AM
ORDER denying16 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. While Petitioner has demonstrated his inability to pay, he has failed to state the issues that he intends to present on appeal. See Fed. R. App. P. 24(a). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/6/2018. (cg) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/31 10:08 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Joshua Recasner. (cg) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
appeal
USCA Case Number
Fri 07/13 2:24 PM
USCA Case Number 18-30809 appealed to Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals for14 Notice of Appeal filed by Joshua Recasner (sbs) |
|
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 07/05 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Joshua Recasner as to13 Judgment. (cg) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment
Tue 06/19 2:16 PM
JUDGMENT - The Court, having considered the petition, the record, the applicable law and for the written reasons assigned; IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the federal application for habeas corpus relief filed by Joshua Recasner is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/19/2018.(cg) |
|
12 | 12
order
Certificate of Appealability Denied by USDC
Tue 06/19 2:14 PM
Certificate of Appealability Denied by USDC - Petitioner has failed to make a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right for the reasons set forth in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation, which this Court adopted as its opinion. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/19/2018.(cg) |
|
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Tue 06/19 2:13 PM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS9 . IT IS ORDERED that the federal application for habeas corpus relief filed by Joshua Recasner is DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/19/2018.(cg) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Thu 08/17 2:49 PM
OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re9 Report and Recommendations, by Joshua Recasner.(bwn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Report and Recommendations
Tue 07/25 3:58 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Joshua Recasner. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the petition be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 8/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 7/25/2017. (cms) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Tue 06/20 2:58 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Christopher James Ponoroff for Robert Tanner. Attorney Donald G. Cassels, III terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 6/20/2017. (cms) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Mon 06/19 3:15 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) by Robert Tanner.(Ponoroff, Christopher) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Substitute Attorney
Mon 06/19 3:14 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Christopher J. Ponoroff to be substituted in place of Donald G. Cassels, III by Robert Tanner. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III.Attorney Christopher James Ponoroff added to party Robert Tanner(pty:dft).(Ponoroff, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/19 3:02 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) as to Robert Tanner answer due 6/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 4/19/2017. (cms) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/18 1:19 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re2 Habeas Corpus Response Order,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) by Robert Tanner. Motion(s) referred to Daniel E. Knowles, III.Attorney Donald G. Cassels, III added to party Robert Tanner(pty:dft).(Cassels, Donald) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint)
Thu 03/30 1:50 PM
Return of Service of Cert.Mail Return Receipt H/C Response Order served on LA A.G. on 3/23/2017; served on Clerk, Criminal Court, Orleans Parish on 3/24/2017; served on D.A., Orleans Parish on 3/24/2017.(mmm) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Habeas Corpus Response Order
Tue 03/21 8:14 AM
Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana, the District Attorney, and the Clerk for Orleans Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 3/20/2017.(cms) (cms) |
|
Att: 1 (3/21/2017) Receipt Numbers | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254)
Mon 03/20 2:24 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Joshua Recasner.(mmm) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |