Harts et al v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Susie Morgan |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02298 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 5:26 AM CDT |
Defendant
AstraZeneca LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diane Harts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Louis Harts
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Receipt
Thu 09/07 11:31 AM
Receipt of Case Transfer by District of New Jersey (lag) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 08/14 5:03 PM
ORDER of MDL Transfer to District of New Jersey. MDL case number 2789. Electronic file sent.(clc) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter | ||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL
Mon 08/14 4:42 PM
Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2789. (clc) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/07 11:15 AM
NOTICE by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP re22 Order Staying Case, MDL No. 2789 Transfer Order .(Callihan, Lawton) |
|
Att: 1 JPML Order | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order Staying Case
Fri 07/07 1:58 PM
ORDER: ORDERED that the above-captioned cases are STAYED AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending the decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on how the cases will proceed. Counsel may move to re-open the case at any time. FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall notify the Court of the outcome of the request to transfer within seven days of the decision of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/6/2017.(clc) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 06/29 10:18 AM
ORDER that all current deadlines for responsive pleadings and briefings in the above cases are CONTINUED WITHOUT DATE. FURTHER ORDER that counsel shall email the Court no later than WEDNESDAY, JULY 5, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. with any objections to the Court issuing a stay in the above cases pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/29/2017. (clc) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 06/23 2:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (clc) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 06/23 2:45 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/23/2017. (clc) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 06/23 10:54 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.(Callihan, Lawton) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Tue 06/20 6:16 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Sileo, John) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim/FRCP12(b)(6)
Thu 06/08 1:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/28/2017.(Callihan, Lawton) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 06/01 4:47 PM
Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP (Callihan, Lawton) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 05/26 1:37 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP filed by Louis Harts, Diane Harts.(clc) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 05/26 11:09 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re11 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental & Amending Complaint . ** Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (clc) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 05/26 1:36 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/25/2017. (clc) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 05/25 11:09 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental & Amending Complaint by Louis Harts, Diane Harts. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby.(Sileo, John) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 05/18 11:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susie Morgan: Status Conference held on 5/15/2017. Plaintiffs shall have until Thursday, May 25, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. to file amended complaints. The parties shall file proposed joint discovery order in each case by Monday, June 5, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. (clc) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 05/09 4:13 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to AstraZeneca LP a, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP answer due 6/12/2017. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/9/2017. (clc) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/09 1:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP served on 5/1/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Sileo, John) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/09 1:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; AstraZeneca LP served on 5/1/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Sileo, John) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 05/05 1:08 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP.Attorney Diana Cole Surprenant added to party AstraZeneca LP(pty:dft), Attorney Diana Cole Surprenant added to party AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP(pty:dft).(Surprenant, Diana) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 04/26 1:53 PM
ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/15/2017 03:00 PM before Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 4/25/2017.(clc) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Transferring Case
Wed 03/22 4:47 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Judge Lance M Africk, Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/22/2017.(blg) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 03/22 10:24 AM
Summons Issued as to AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP. (bwn) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 03/21 8:56 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (djg) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Louis Harts, Diane Harts.Attorney John D. Sileo added to party Louis Harts(pty:pla), Attorney John D. Sileo added to party Diane Harts (pty:pla).(Sileo, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
misc
Filing Fee Payment - Case Opening - 400 dollars
Mon 03/20 5:18 PM
Filing fee paid from All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6035124) (Sileo, John) |