Chavis v. Janssen Research & Development LLC et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02300 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 5:28 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bayer AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare LLC
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Pharma AG
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Ortho LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Research & Development LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Bayer HealthCare AG
|
|
Defendant
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Wanda L. Chavis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 01/29 4:15 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE- originally filed as rec. doc. 12426 in master case 14-md-2592.(mmv) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association
Tue 03/21 11:30 AM
PRETRIAL ORDERS #1 - #31. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(ADI) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Bayer AG, Bayer Healthcare AG, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Bayer Pharma AG, Janssen Ortho LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Research & Development LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (ss) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 03/20 2:47 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 2:07 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6034087) filed by Wanda L. Chavis.Attorney Ethan L. Shaw added to party Wanda L. Chavis(pty:pla).(Shaw, Ethan) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |