Douglas et al v. DePhillips et al
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lance M Africk |
Referred: | Daniel E Knowles, III |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02305 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 5:17 AM CDT |
Defendant
Matthew DePhillips
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unidentified Parties
|
|
Defendant
Brian Trainor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rodney Jack Strain, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Randy Smith
New Orleans, LA 70119
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fred Oswald
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Josh Williams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Grey Thurman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jacob Jenkins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cristen Graham
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alex Dantaghan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
L. C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Sheppard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
61 | 61
appeal
USCA Judgment
Thu 08/30 3:18 PM
USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 8/22/2018 as to51 Notice of Appeal filed by Richard Douglas, L. C., Jessica Sheppard. USCA judge name: Jolly, Owen, and Haynes. ORDERED and adjudged that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs-appellants pay to defendants-appellees the costs on appeal to be taxed by the Clerk of this Court. (blg) |