Caytrans BBC, LLC v. Sea Central Shipping Corp.
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jane Triche Milazzo |
Referred: | Michael North |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02308 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Sea Central Shipping Corp.
614 Monterey Blvd N.E.
St. Petersburg, FL 33704 |
|
Plaintiff
Caytrans BBC, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment - Default ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 06/27 10:56 AM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered in favor of Caytrans BBC, LLC against Sea Central Shipping Corp. in the amount of $47,370.00. Plaintiff's13 MOTION for Default Judgment is GRANTED, Plaintiff's11 MOTION for Default Judgment is MOOT. Signed by clerk.(ecm) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 06/27 10:35 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re13 MOTION for Entry of Default ; Incorrect event. Filing attorney should have selected the event Motion for Default Judgment. Clerk modified the event. No further action necessary. (ecm) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Entry of Default
Mon 06/26 5:12 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sea Central Shipping Corp. by Caytrans BBC, LLC.(Swaim, Frederick) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Fri 06/02 10:43 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re11 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sea Central Shipping Corp. ; Incorrect event. Filing attorney should have selected the event Motion for Default Judgment. Clerk modified the event. No further action necessary. (ecm) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Entry of Default
Thu 06/01 3:56 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sea Central Shipping Corp. by Caytrans BBC, LLC.(Swaim, Frederick) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Tue 05/09 10:42 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Entry of Default as to Sea Central Shipping Corp. Signed by clerk. (Copy mailed to defendant in default). (ecm) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 05/09 10:33 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sea Central Shipping Corp. ; (1) Filing attorney should have selected Yes at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?' before clicking the Next button. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte'. (2) Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. All future Exparte/Consent Motions must contain a Proposed Order. No action necessary at this time. (ecm) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Entry of Default
Mon 05/08 4:54 PM
EXPARTE MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sea Central Shipping Corp. by Caytrans BBC, LLC. (Swaim, Frederick) Modified on 5/9/2017 (ecm) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Thu 05/04 12:41 PM
ORDER denying6 Motion for Entry of Default. Prior to obtaining a default judgment, there must be an entry default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Entry of Default
Tue 05/02 5:12 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sea Central Shipping Corp. by Caytrans BBC, LLC.(Swaim, Frederick) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 04/10 2:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed; Sea Central Shipping Corp. served on 4/6/2017, answer due 4/27/2017. (Swaim, Frederick) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk
Tue 03/21 3:02 PM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf. For future filings, properly formatted pdf's will not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. IMPORTANT: When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (mf) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/21 2:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Sea Central Shipping Corp. (mf) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 03/21 9:37 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (djg) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Sea Central Shipping Corp. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6035065) filed by Caytrans BBC, LLC.Attorney Frederick William Swaim, III added to party Caytrans BBC, LLC(pty:pla).(Swaim, Frederick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits A-G, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |