Trisler et al v. LifeShare Blood Centers
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Dee D Drell |
Referred: | Joseph H L Perez-Montes |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00421 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:40 AM CDT |
Defendant
LifeShare Blood Centers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lecreatia Rawls
1370 Plum St
Beaumont, TX 77703 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nia Robinson
1296 Georgia Ave
Port Allen, LA 70767 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Pursley
9751 E1 Scott Ave
Baton Rouge, LA 70811 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cathy Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ravonda Norman
354 A State Park Rd
Natchez, MS 39120 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexis Neville
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angel Morris
118 Grisaffi Ln
Belle Rose, LA 70341 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Destiny Mink
5412 Old Marksville Hwy
Pineville, LA 71360 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryant McDonald
5110 Oriole
Beaumont, TX 77707 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie McClain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Audreuna McCarter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elaine Matthews
1104 S 12th St
Monroe, LA 71202 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eunice Mason
23 Martha Dr
Monroe, LA 71203 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dave Solomon Marie, Jr
214 Belle Trace Rd
Lecompte, LA 71346 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kasey N Leckie
217 Jackson Sq Blvd D
Shreveport, LA 71115 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederickea Lawson
2707 Norwood St #412
Marshall, TX 75670 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Judy L Knighton
63975 Bayou Rd
Plaquemine, LA 70764 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Kindrix
120 Westridge Apt B
West Monroe, LA 71291 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Taylor
2604 Benton Rd Apt 107
Bossier City, LA 71111 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yolanda Wright
2111 Delaware St
Texarkana, AR 71854 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chyla Wilson
2101 Utah Dr
Shreveport, LA 71101 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alicia L Williams
2420 Valley St
Baton Rouge, LA 70808 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pauline Whitney
6690 Daisy
Lumberton, TX 77657 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kayla White
153 Coates St
Columbia, LA 71418 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Courtney Ware
770 West River Rd
Oakdale, LA 71463 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Ward
57 David St
Alexandria, LA 71301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amber Vargas
100 Sheryl Lane Apt A 2
New Llano, LA 71461 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Diana Turner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dominique Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miranda Streetman
192 Tucker Rd
Jena, LA 71342 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shealyn Stokely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shenequa Spencer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cornelius Smith, Jr
1513 Parkview Dr
Monroe, LA 71202 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karissa Shantel Scott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley Schneider
400 John Wesley #75
Bossier City, LA 71112 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Schaper
P O Box 113
Blanchard, LA 71009 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mikesha Jolivet
915 Goliad St
Beaumont, TX 77701 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laterica Cain
11746 Catalpa St
Baton Rouge, LA 70815 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeanette Ferguson
6304 Bluegrass Dr
Baton Rouge, LA 70812 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shondolyn Ensley
1316 Gibson Dr
Bossier, LA 71112 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia A Elmore
81 Holiday
Monroe, LA 71201 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brianca Delton
20915 Hwy 175
Pelican, LA 71063 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Davis, Jr
12337 Old Bonita Rd
Bastrop, LA 71220 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeannie Fay Davidson-Harris
609 E 10th St
Smackover, AR 71762 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawron Clavelle
3940 E 7th St
Port Arthur, TX 77642 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Fontenot
58247 Plaquemine St
Plaquemine, LA 70764 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tabatha Brown
6070 Alpine Circle #2
Beaumont, TX 77708 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jasmine C Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kristina Beverly
P O Box 1823
Ruston, LA 71273 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiaeh Rome Antoine
1675 A Monte Sano Ave
Baton Rouge, LA 70807 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lafayette Romeka Anderson
42 Tuscany Way
Rayville, LA 71269 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Crystal Allen
4464 Haynesville Hwy
El Dorado, AR 71730 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natasha Trisler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heather Savage
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andrea M Groshong
212 Deer Valley Rd
El Dorado, AR 71730 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LaNiece Johnson
5221 Hwy 527
Haughton, LA 71037 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexandra Johnson
39 Cleveland
Texarkana, AR 71854 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carrie James
6836 Autumn Ave
Baton Rouge, LA 70812 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicole A Howard
5666 Satinwood Dr
Baton Rouge, LA 70812 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ebony Holyfield
1567 Hwy 9
Summerfield, LA 71079 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natasha Holmes
3720 Laurel #7
Beaumont, TX 77707 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Samantha Holder
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Layvfette Hill
1616 Arkansas Rd #136
West Monroe, LA 71292 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaleisha Jones
3772 River Boat Lane #52
Addis, LA 70710 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Takachel R Green
124 Bluff Springs
Mineral Springs, AR 71851 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mecos Green
5026 Waters Place
Shreveport, LA 71109 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashley E Goudeau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kierra Godwin
2912 Tulsa Rd
Shreveport, LA 71107 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leshia Gipson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharone N Gillion
3253 Redwood Dr
Alexandria, LA 71301 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Labrisha Ford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Krystal Fontenot
32255 Hwy 405
White Castle, LA 70788 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, November 05, 2021 | ||
208 | 208
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Order on Motion for Settlement
Fri 11/05 1:37 PM
JUDGMENT granting207 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss; granting207 Motion for Settlement. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 11/5/2021. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
207 | 207
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Settlement
Thu 11/04 2:10 PM
JOINT MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement by LifeShare Blood Centers, All Plantiffs. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/4/2021.(aty,Carnie, Brian). Added MOTION for Settlement and filers on 11/4/2021 (Crick, S) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 11/04 3:50 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to207 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Approval of Settlement Agreement. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/4/2021. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
Wednesday, November 03, 2021 | ||
206 | 206
minutes
Telephone Conference
Thu 11/04 11:39 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Dee D Drell: (NO PDF ATTACHED)TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 11/3/2021. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
Monday, November 01, 2021 | ||
205 | 205
order
Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 11/01 4:36 PM
MINUTE ENTRY: A Telephone Conference is set for 11/3/2021 at 3:00 PM by phone before the undersigned. A call-in number will be sent via email. Signed by Judge Dee D. Drell on 11/1/2021. (crt,Tice, Y) |