Addison v. Celadon Trucking Services Inc et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Dee D Drell |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00418 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 27, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:14 AM CDT |
Defendant
Celadon Trucking Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph Owobu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Travis Addison, Sr
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Aon Risk Services Southwest Inc
Terminated: 07/21/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Fri 07/27 11:18 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting23 Joint/Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 7/26/2018. (crt,Roaix, G) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 08/07 1:13 PM
***CASE Reassigned to Duty Judge Dee D Drell. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to the case. Administrative entry due to case closure and for statistical purposes. (NEF deselected to counsel.) (crt,Reeves, T) |
||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary
Wed 07/25 4:17 PM
JOINT MOTION for Dismissal with Prejudice by All Parties. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna.(aty,Caruso, Susan) Modified on 7/25/2018 to edit filers (Putch, A) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed order | ||
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension (Other)
Fri 05/04 4:22 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Extension of Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Daubert Motions due by 7/20/2018. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 6/21/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 7/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/4/2018. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension (Other)
Thu 05/03 2:06 PM
JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Scheduling Order Deadlines with consent by All Parties. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna.(aty,Caruso, Susan) Modified on 5/3/2018 to edit filers (Putch, A) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension (Other)
Fri 03/23 2:06 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Defense Expert Report Deadline. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 5/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/23/2018. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension (Other)
Thu 03/22 5:39 PM
MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Defense Expert Report Deadline Contained in Scheduling Order with consent by Celadon Trucking Services Inc, Joseph Owobu. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna.(aty,Caruso, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Allowing Rule 26 Report
Mon 10/16 1:49 PM
ORDER: Having reviewed the Rule 26(f) Report and determined it to be complete, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court file it in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/16/2017. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 10/12 4:40 PM
RULE 26(f) Report by Travis Addison, Sr, Celadon Truckin Services, Joseph Owobu . (aty,Keelen-Williams, Raynique) Modified to add filers on 10/12/2017. (ThomasSld, T) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case
Thu 10/05 1:51 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Unassigned District Judge. Judge Rebecca F Doherty no longer assigned to case. All pending motions are referred to the assigned magistrate judge for processing. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 10/02/2017.(crt,Putch, A) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order - Hanna/Whitehurst
Fri 08/25 9:03 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/1/2018 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 2 before Judge Rebecca F Doherty. Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2018 10:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Rebecca F Doherty. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 9/14/2017. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 9/18/2017. Rule 26 Report due by 10/12/2017. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 3/22/2018. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 2/20/2018. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 3/22/2018. Discovery deadline 4/23/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2018. Daubert Motions due by 5/21/2018. Motions in Limine due by 8/20/2018. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 8/20/2018. Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2018. Bench Books due by 9/4/2018. Trial Depositions due by 9/4/2018. Real Time glossary due by 9/11/2018. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 9/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/24/2017. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Dismissing Case/Party (LR41.3)
Fri 07/21 4:38 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Aon Risk Services Southwest Inc by Clerk under LR41.3. Case may be reinstated within 30 days for good cause shown. Issued by Staff Attorney for Tony R Moore, Clerk of Court on 7/21/2017. (crt,Putch, A) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Tue 07/18 6:25 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Travis Addison, Sr. List of Pleadings .(aty,Keelen-Williams, Raynique) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service | ||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/17 11:49 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Joseph Owobu.(Attorney Susan Marie Caruso added to party Joseph Owobu(pty:dft))(aty,Caruso, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/12 11:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travis Addison, Sr. Joseph Owobu served on 6/16/2017, answer due 7/7/2017. (aty,Keelen-Williams, Raynique) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included)
Thu 07/06 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Intent to dismiss Joseph Owobu for Failure to effect service within 90 days. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included)
Thu 07/06 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Intent to dismiss Aon Risk Services Southwest Inc for Failure to take default 60 days after service. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Response to Removal Order
Fri 04/21 1:49 PM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Aon Risk Services Southwest Inc, Celadon Trucking Services Inc .(aty,Caruso, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Record | ||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/25 11:26 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed in Case 16-10725 B, 15th JDC, Acadia Parish, on 9/12/2016 by Celadon Trucking Services Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading filed within pdf of attachment to8 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Putch, A) |
||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Tue 04/25 11:43 AM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed as to Aon Risk Services Southwest Inc, filed in Case 16-10725 B, 15th JDC, Acadia Parish, on 8/30/2016. Aon Risk Services Southwest Inc answer due 3/27/2017. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading filed within pdf of attachment to8 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Putch, A) |
||
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Tue 04/25 11:47 AM
UNEXECUTED - STATE COURT Service Returned unexecuted as to Joseph Owobu, filed in Case 16-10725 B, 15th JDC, Acadia Parish, on 12/01/2016. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading filed within pdf of attachment to8 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Putch, A) |
||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Wed 04/19 11:12 AM
JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING. The undersigned finds that the parties are diverse and that the amount in controversy exceeds the jurisdictional minimum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 4/19/2017. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/03 4:39 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aon Risk Services Southwest Inc identifying Corporate Parent Aon Corporation for Aon Risk Services Southwest Inc. (aty,Caruso, Susan) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/03 11:05 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Celadon Trucking Services Inc identifying Corporate Parent Celadon Group, Inc. for Celadon Trucking Services Inc. (aty,Caruso, Susan) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Removal Order
Fri 03/24 9:05 AM
REMOVAL ORDER forwarded to all counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 3/23/2017. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Mon 03/20 2:41 PM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Mon 03/20 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal, sent to Milton Davis Ready, Joshua Michael Hudson, Susan Marie Caruso on behalf of Aon Risk Services Southwest, Inc., Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/3/2017. (crt,Thigpen, M) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/20 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Acadia Parish, Case Number 2016-10725 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3318976) filed by Celadon Trucking Services, Inc., Aon Risk Services Southwest, Inc..(Attorney Susan Marie Caruso added to party Aon Risk Services Southwest, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan Marie Caruso added to party Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Caruso, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 03/20 2:29 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Rebecca F Doherty and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Thigpen, M) |