Davidson v. LNU et al
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando J Gaitan, Jr |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00200 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1981 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 5:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
City of N.K.C.
|
|
Defendant
Officer Becky LNU
|
|
Defendant
N.K.C Police Department
|
|
Plaintiff
Dewayne Davidson
P.O. Box 12682
North Kansas City, MO 64116 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Clerk's Judgment
Mon 04/10 2:57 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Enss, Rhonda). (Copy of document sent to plaintiff by regular mail at address indicated in order.) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 04/10 12:53 PM
ORDER granting1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing plaintiff's complaint under 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed on 04/10/2017 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Powers, Jo). Modified on 4/10/2017 to note copy of document sent to plaintiff by regular mail at address indicated in order (Enss, Rhonda) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Wed 03/22 3:44 PM
PRO SE NOTICE of change of address by Dewayne Davidson (Watson, Olivette) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Financial Affidavit
Mon 03/20 12:21 PM
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Dewayne Davidson. (Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 12:20 PM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dewayne Davidson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/3/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |