Morris v. GC Services, LP
Missouri Western District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Phillips |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00201 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 5:26 AM CDT |
Defendant
GC Services, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony G Morris, Jr.
2104 Wabash Ave
Kansas City, MO 64127 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 07/06 3:24 PM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Anthony G Morris, Jr. (Melvin, Greg) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Clerk's Judgment
Mon 06/12 11:17 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (McIlvain, Kelly) Modified on 6/12/2017: A copy of Order (Doc. 19) and a copy of the Clerk's Judgment (Doc. 20) were mailed via regular US Mail on 6/12/17 to Anthony G. Morris, Jr., 2104 Wabash Ave., Kansas City, MO 64127 (Cordell, Annette) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 06/12 11:14 AM
ORDER granting defendant's10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed on 6/12/2017 by District Judge Beth Phillips. (McIlvain, Kelly) Modified on 6/12/2017: A copy of Order (Doc. 19) and a copy of the Clerks Judgment (Doc. 20) were mailed via regular US Mail on 6/12/17 to Anthony G. Morris, Jr., 2104 Wabash Ave., Kansas City, MO 64127. (Cordell, Annette) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 06/05 2:12 PM
NOTICE of filing Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to the Order to Show Cause by GC Services, LP re17 Response to Order to Show Cause (Libman, Vitaly) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 05/23 10:26 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Anthony G Morris, Jr. (Melvin, Greg) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 05/22 3:25 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Anthony G. Morris, Jr.. Scheduling and Trial Order, Doc14 , returned "attempted - not known/unable to forward."(Cordell, Annette) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 05/19 11:11 AM
CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Anthony G. Morris, Jr.(Doc. 6 - Order/Rule 6) returned with notation "Unclaimed/Unable to Forward." Cert Mail receipt ending 9752. (Cordell, Annette) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 05/15 11:20 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/21/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 3/21/2018. Teleconference set for 7/20/2018 10:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2018 11:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 8/13/2018 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 5/15/17 by District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Scheduling Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 5/15/17 to: Anthony G. Morris, Jr., 2104 Wabash Ave., Kansas City, MO 64127. (Cordell, Annette) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 05/10 1:44 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, within 14 days, as to why Defendant's Motion to Dismiss should not be granted. Defendant shall then have 14 days thereafter to address Plaintiff's response. Signed on 5/10/17 by District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Order was mailed on 5/10/17 via regular and certified US Mail (cert mail return receipt no. 7015 0640 0000 9979 5828) to Anthony G. Morris, Jr., 2104 Wabash Ave., Kansas City, MO 64127. (Cordell, Annette) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Mon 05/08 2:57 PM
Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by GC Services, LP. (Libman, Vitaly) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Suggestions in Support of Motion
Mon 04/17 2:38 PM
SUGGESTIONS in support re10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Vitaly Libman on behalf of Defendant GC Services, LP. (Libman, Vitaly) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 04/17 2:37 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Vitaly Libman on behalf of GC Services, LP. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/1/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Libman, Vitaly) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 04/03 3:10 PM
MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable. Mail sent to Anthony G. Morris (Order, Rule 16, Document 6) returned "attempted-not known/unable to forward." (Cordell, Annette) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 03/27 12:44 PM
ORDER granting7 : Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant has up to and including April 17, 2017 to file a responsive pleading. Signed on 3/27/17 by District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. A copy of this docket text Order was mailed via regular US Mail on 3/27/17 to Plaintiff Anthony G. Morris, Jr., 2104 Wabash Ave., Kansas City, MO 64127.(Cordell, Annette) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 03/24 11:10 AM
MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Vitaly Libman on behalf of GC Services, LP. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/7/2017 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Libman, Vitaly) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Rule 16 Notice
Wed 03/22 12:40 PM
ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 5/8/2017. Rule 26 conference due by 4/24/2017. Signed on 3/22/17 by District Judge Beth Phillips. A copy of this Rule 16 Order was mailed via regular and certified US Mail on 3/23/17 to: Anthony G. Morris, Jr., 2104 Wabash Ave., Kansas City, MO 64127. Certified mail return receipt no. 7006 2760 0000 6393 9752. (Cordell, Annette) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of MAPN
Mon 03/20 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Ellis, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
4 | 4
discov
Disclosure of corporate interests
Mon 03/20 2:00 PM
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Vitaly Libman on behalf of Defendant GC Services, LP.(Libman, Vitaly) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing
Mon 03/20 1:58 PM
NOTICE of filing Notice to the Plaintiff of Notice of Removal by GC Services, LP (Libman, Vitaly) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/20 1:56 PM
NOTICE of appearance by Vitaly Libman on behalf of GC Services, LP (Libman, Vitaly) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/20 1:53 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County Circuit Court County, case number 1716-CV03629, GC Services, LP. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0866-5219549.(Libman, Vitaly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |