Rentzell v. Berryhill
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Kopf |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-03037 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:0405 Review of HHS Decision |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2018 |
Defendant
Nancy A. Berryhill
|
|
Interested Party
Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
|
|
Plaintiff
Susan M. Rentzell
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
order
Judgment
Tue 05/01 3:43 PM
JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the court's Memorandum and Order28 filed this date, JUDGMENT is entered providing that the final decision of the Commissioner is affirmed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (CS) |
|
28 | 28
22
pgs
order
Order on Motion Reversing the Commissioner's Decision Order on Motion Affirming the Commissioner's Decision
Tue 05/01 3:41 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Order reversing the Commissioner's decision (Filing No.17 ) is denied. Defendant's Motion to Affirm the Commissioner's Decision (Filing No.23 ) is granted. The Commissioner's decision is affirmed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Judgment will be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (CS) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
oth_doc
Brief
Fri 12/29 2:38 PM
BRIEF in Reply to Brief of Defendant by Attorney Warren L. Reimer on behalf of Plaintiff Susan M. Rentzell |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 12/15 9:22 AM
TEXT ORDER - Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Filing25 ) within which to file a reply brief is GRANTED, and Plaintiff shall file her reply brief on or before December 29, 2017. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extend
Thu 12/14 8:15 AM
MOTION to Extend Time to Submit Reply Brief in Support of Motion for an Order Reversing the Commissioner's Decision by Attorney Warren L. Reimer on behalf of Plaintiff Susan M. Rentzell |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
oth_doc
Brief
Thu 11/30 5:26 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION for an Order Affirming the Commissioner's Decision 23 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Wagner, Lynnett) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Affirming Commissioner's Decision
Thu 11/30 5:25 PM
MOTION for an Order Affirming the Commissioner's Decision by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Wagner, Lynnett) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Thu 10/26 9:48 AM
TEXT ORDER - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Filing21 ) is GRANTED, and Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Brief (Filing20 ) on or before December 1, 2017. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 14 days after Defendant's brief is filed. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extend
Wed 10/25 3:11 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Brief20 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Wagner, Lynnett) |
|
Sunday, October 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
oth_doc
Brief
Sun 10/01 8:53 PM
BRIEF in support of MOTION for an Order Reversing the Commissioner's Decision 17 by Attorney Warren L. Reimer on behalf of Plaintiff Susan M. Rentzell |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Extend
Fri 09/01 12:03 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time (Filing No. 18]) to file a brief in support of his Motion for Order Reversing the Commissioner's decision (Filing No.17 ) is granted. Plaintiff's brief in support of his Motion for Order Reversing the Commissioner's decision (Filing No.17 ) shall be filed on or before October 2, 2017. The Commissioner shall file a motion for an order affirming the Commissioner's decision, or granting other relief, with supporting brief on or before November 1, 2017. Plaintiff may file a reply brief on or before November 15, 2017, after which this matter shall be considered submitted for decision. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LAC) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extend
Thu 08/31 4:04 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Submit Brief in Support of Motion for an Order Reversing the Commissioner's Decision by Attorney Warren L. Reimer on behalf of Plaintiff Susan M. Rentzell |
|
17 | 17
motion
Reversing Commissioner's Decision
Thu 08/31 4:01 PM
MOTION for an Order Reversing the Commissioner's Decision by Attorney Warren L. Reimer on behalf of Plaintiff Susan M. Rentzell |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order - GO 2010-11 (TEXT ONLY)
Wed 07/12 9:17 AM
TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to General Order 2010-11, the parties did not timely consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LAC) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Letter
Mon 07/10 1:12 PM
SCHEDULING LETTER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/9/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
oth_doc
Certificate
Fri 07/07 1:51 PM
Certificate regarding Social Security Administrative Record,,12 , Social Security Administrative Record,,13 by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Wagner, Lynnett) |
|
13 | 13
oth_evt
Social Security Administrative Record
Fri 07/07 1:47 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(c). VOLUME II OF II Filed by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Wagner, Lynnett) |
|
Att: 1 Medical Records, Pt. 4 (pp. 484-544), | ||
Att: 2 Medical Records, Pt. 5 (pp. 545-591), | ||
Att: 3 Medical Records, Pt. 6 (pp. 592-623), | ||
Att: 4 Medical Records, Pt. 7 (pp. 624-667), | ||
Att: 5 Medical Records, Pt. 8 (pp. 668-684), | ||
Att: 6 Medical Records, Pt. 9 (pp. 685-729), | ||
Att: 7 Medical Records, Pt. 10 (pp. 730-793), | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records, Pt. 11 (pp. 794-869), | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records, Pt. 12 (pp. 870-903) | ||
12 | 12
oth_evt
Social Security Administrative Record
Fri 07/07 1:39 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(c). VOLUME I OF II Filed by Attorney Lynnett M. Wagner on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Wagner, Lynnett) |
|
Att: 1 Index, | ||
Att: 2 Admin Process Docs (pp. 1-98), | ||
Att: 3 Payment Docs (pp. 99-158), | ||
Att: 4 Jurisdictional Docs (pp. 159-236), | ||
Att: 5 Non Disability Docs (pp. 237-266), | ||
Att: 6 Disability Docs, Pt. 1 (pp. 267-318), | ||
Att: 7 Disability Docs, Pt. 2 (pp. 319-357), | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records, Pt. 1 (pp. 358-368), | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records, Pt. 2 (pp. 369-458), | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records, Pt. 3 (pp. 459-483) | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 07/07 1:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Nancy A. Berryhill (Wagner, Lynnett) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/03 2:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Robert C. Stuart, Acting U.S. Attorney for the District of Nebraska, on behalf of defendant Nancy A. Berryhill on 5/10/2017. |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/03 2:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Jeff Sessions, U.S. Attorney General, on behalf of defendant Nancy A. Berryhill on 5/15/2017. |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 07/03 2:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon the General Counsel c/o Region VII of Social Security on behalf of the defendant Nancy A. Berryhill on 5/11/2017. |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/20 3:42 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Social Security Administration, US Attorney's Office, and US Attorney General. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (KLF) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order - Social Security GO 2015-05
Mon 03/20 3:34 PM
GENERAL ORDER NO. 2015-05: In the Matter of Procedures for Social Security Cases. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KLF) |
|
5 | 5
oth_evt
Assignment of Judges
Mon 03/20 3:30 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. (KLF) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Requested
Mon 03/20 3:29 PM
Summons Requested as to Robert C. Stuart, Acting U.S. Attorney for the District of Nebraska, on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill regarding Complaint1 . |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Requested
Mon 03/20 3:26 PM
Summons Requested as to Jeff Sessions, U.S. Attorney General on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill regarding Complaint1 . |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Requested
Mon 03/20 3:23 PM
Summons Requested as to Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security regarding Complaint1 . |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0867-3409935), by Attorney Warren L. Reimer on behalf of Susan M. Rentzel |