Boskie v. Backgroundchecks.com
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Barbara Mg Lynn |
Referred: | Irma Carrillo Ramirez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00782 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:59 AM CDT |
Defendant
Backgroundchecks.com LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Boskie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Keller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hadel Toma
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
72 | 72
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/30 10:45 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by George Boskie, Terry Keller, Hadel Toma. (Drake, Eleanor) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Thu 08/30 11:02 AM
Civil Case Terminated per72 Stipulation of Dismissal. (zkc) |