Morales v. USA
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Referred: | Irma Carrillo Ramirez |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00783 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 14, 2019 |
Petitioner
Felix Morales
|
|
Respondent
USA
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Mon 01/14 3:29 PM
JUDGMENT: Petitioner's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct Sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is denied, and this habeas action is dismissed with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/14/2019) |
|
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Mon 01/14 3:22 PM
Order Accepting13 Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge and Denying Certificate of Appealability. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 1/14/2019) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 01/14 3:31 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15, 16. Mon Jan 14 15:31:19 CST 2019 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Remark
Wed 11/28 8:54 AM
AUSA Timothy Funnell has separated from the NDTX. Per the clerk's office agreement with the AUSA, Wes Hendrix is returned to active status. (twd) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Mon 11/26 8:38 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION on Case re:2 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. The motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 should be DENIED with prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/26/2018) (ykp) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 11/26 8:39 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Mon Nov 26 08:39:14 CST 2018 (crt) |
||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 05/12 3:47 PM
RESPONSE filed by Felix Morales re:6 MOTION to Vacate. |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response/Objection
Wed 04/19 1:26 PM
RESPONSE filed by USA re:6 MOTION to Vacate (Funnell-DOJ, Timothy) |
|
Saturday, April 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel - AUSA - AFPD
Sat 04/01 1:49 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Timothy Wayne Funnell-DOJ added as AUSA. (Funnell-DOJ, Timothy) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer
Wed 03/29 4:10 PM
Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and regenerated notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/29/2017) (axm) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 03/29 9:00 AM
ORDER denying movant's7 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/29/2017) (mcrd) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/29 9:00 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Wed Mar 29 09:00:35 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/29 4:11 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. Wed Mar 29 16:11:04 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 03/28 9:32 AM
2nd MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Felix Morales (svc) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Vacate
Tue 03/28 9:26 AM
AMENDED MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by Felix Morales (svc) Modified on 3/28/2017 (svc) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 03/22 8:48 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4,5. Wed Mar 22 08:48:14 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order And Notice of Deficiency
Wed 03/22 8:47 AM
Order and Notice of Deficiency: Felix Morales must address the following deficiency: The § 2255 motion is not signed and verified, as required by 28 U.S.C. § 2242 and Rule 2(c)(5) of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Cases. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/21/2017) (sss) |
|
Att: 1 2255 Motion | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Wed 03/22 8:46 AM
ORDER: The movant has not shown that justice requires the appointment of counsel at this stage of the process, and his3 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 3/21/2017) (sss) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Mon 03/20 1:17 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Felix Morales. (sss) |
|
2 | 2
mot2255
Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255
Mon 03/20 1:16 PM
MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 3:14-cr-213) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sss) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Mon 03/20 1:15 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sss) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 03/20 1:17 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1. Mon Mar 20 13:17:33 CDT 2017 (crt) |