Beckerman v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00784 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 5:16 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy International Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson International
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Products Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Beckerman
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, May 11, 2022 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Wed 05/11 8:58 AM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) |
||
Tuesday, May 10, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Stipulation
Tue 05/10 11:11 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Donald Beckerman. (Clevenger, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A - List of Cases | ||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 1:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Donald Beckerman. (Clevenger, Nicholas) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/20 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Related Case filed by Donald Beckerman (Clevenger, Nicholas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 1:18 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Donald Beckerman. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8286413) Summons(es) not requested at this time. Filer indicates this case is related to MDL Case No. 2244, In re: DePuy Orthopedics, Inc., Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, pending before Judge Ed Kinkeade. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Clevenger, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet |