Sampson v. Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | John Mcbryde |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00241 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2017 4:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc
1201 Louisiana 28th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC
Hughes Watters Askanase 1201 Louisiana 28th Floor
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Central Loan Administration and Reporting FSB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Equity Loans, LLC
|
|
Defendant
David Stockton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Sampson
J. Gannon Helstowski Law Firm 4150 International Plaza Ste. 102
Fort Worth, TX 76109 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Mon 05/15 12:17 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT...In accordance with stipulation of dismissal...all claims of pltf against defendants are dismissed w/o prej; each party to bear court costs and atty's fees. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/15/2017) (wrb) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/12 4:01 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by Central Loan Administration and Reporting FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC, Bryan Sampson. (wrb) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/05 8:36 AM
NOTICE of Intent to Voluntary Dismiss without Prejudice filed by Bryan Sampson (wrb) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation
Fri 05/05 8:35 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL without Prejudice by Central Loan Administration and Reporting FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC, Bryan Sampson. (wrb) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Thu 04/20 10:57 AM
ORDER FOR REPLEADING: The court ORDERS that by May 4, 2017, plaintiff file an amended pleading to be titled "Plaintiff's Amended Complaint" in compliance with the pleading requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure- and the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the judge-specific requirements of the undersigned, and that by May 18, 2017, defendant file their answers or other responses to such Plaintiff's Amended Complaint in compliance with the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the judge-specific requirements of the undersigned. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 4/20/2017) (tln) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Tue 04/18 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Local Counsel by Michael L Jones on behalf of Central Loan Administration and Reporting FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC. (wrb) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/14 2:14 PM
ORIGINAL ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Petition filed by David Stockton. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Jonathan M Williams added to party David Stockton(pty:dft) (wrb) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/13 12:04 PM
Original ANSWER to Original Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Central Loan Administration and Reporting FSB. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/13 11:37 AM
Original ANSWER to Original Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/13 11:21 AM
Original ANSWER to Original Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 03/29 2:12 PM
ORDER denying5 Motion for leave to appear without local counsel (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/29/2017) (wrb) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 03/29 9:21 AM
MOTION for leave to appear without local counsel filed by Central Loan Administration and Reporting FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC (wrb) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/21 12:19 PM
Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of1 Notice of Removal, filed by Central Loan Administration and Reporting FSB, Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC. (tln) |
|
3 | 3
order
Paper Case Designation Order
Tue 03/21 8:56 AM
Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 3/21/2017) (hth) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
McBryde
Tue 03/21 8:55 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hth) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/20 3:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tarrant, case number 153-290848-17 filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration System Inc, Cenlar FSB, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-8287013) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Neff, Sabrina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C, | ||
Att: 4 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Cover Sheet Supplement | ||
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 03/21 8:47 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Bryan Sampson. (See doc1 for image.) (hth) |